WITTER et al v. STERLINGBROOK EQUINE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JEFF WITTER and MARLA WITTER
Defendant: MARGARET BADALAMENTI AND STEPHANINE MILNE, INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A STERLINGBROOK FARM EVENTS, STERLINGBROOK EQUINE, INC., MARGARET BADALAMENTI, JOAN MILNE, STERLINGBROOK FARM EVENTS LLC, VITO BADALAMENTI, ABC CORPORATION # 1-10 (FICTITIOUS), JOHN DOE #1-10 (fictitious) and STERLINGBROOK FARM
Cross Claimant: MARGARET BADALAMENTI AND STEPHANINE MILNE
Case Number: 3:2019cv14799
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARGARET BADALAMENTI, MARGARET BADALAMENTI AND STEPHANINE MILNE, STERLINGBROOK FARM EVENTS LLC. (GREEN, JAMES)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against ABC CORPORATION # 1-10 (FICTITIOUS), VITO BADALAMENTI, JOHN DOE #1-10 (fictitious), JOAN MILNE, STERLINGBROOK FARM by MARGARET BADALAMENTI, STERLINGBROOK FARM EVENTS LLC, MARGARET BADALAMENTI AND STEPHANINE MILNE. (GREEN, JAMES)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Sterlingbrook Equine, Inc.; STERLINGBROOK EQUINE, INC. terminated. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/28/2019. (jem)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against MARGARET BADALAMENTI, VITO BADALAMENTI, MARGARET BADALAMENTI AND STEPHANINE MILNE, STERLINGBROOK FARM, STERLINGBROOK FARM EVENTS LLC by JOAN MILNE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CURVING, GLENN)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Sterlingbrook Equine, Inc. by STERLINGBROOK EQUINE, INC.. (MOHAN, ANNE)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ABC CORPORATION # 1-10 (FICTITIOUS), VITO BADALAMENTI, JOHN DOE #1-10 (fictitious), MARGARET BADALAMENTI AND STEPHANINE MILNE, JOAN MILNE, STERLINGBROOK EQUINE, INC., STERLINGBROOK FARM by MARGARET BADALAMENTI, STERLINGBROOK FARM EVENTS LLC.(GREEN, JAMES)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by STERLINGBROOK FARM, JOAN MILNE, STERLINGBROOK EQUINE, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/10/2019. (jem)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNE M MOHAN on behalf of JOAN MILNE, STERLINGBROOK EQUINE, INC., STERLINGBROOK FARM (MOHAN, ANNE)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Sterlingbrook Equine, Inc. and Joan Milne Individually and d/b/a Sterlingbrook Farm. Attorney GLENN D. CURVING for JOAN MILNE,GLENN D. CURVING for STERLINGBROOK EQUINE, INC.,GLENN D. CURVING for STERLINGBROOK FARM added. (CURVING, GLENN)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants, Sterlingbrook Farm Events, LLC and Margaret Badalamenti d/b/a Sterlingbrook Farm Events, LLC.. (GREEN, JAMES)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by STERLINGBROOK FARM EVENTS LLC, MARGARET BADALAMENTI AND STEPHANINE MILNE has been DENIED as out of time. This request has been forwarded to chambers. (jem)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Answer to Complaint, Separate Defenses, Demand for Statement of Damages; Designation of Trial Counsel and Jury Demand ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against JOAN MILNE, STERLINGBROOK EQUINE, INC., STERLINGBROOK FARM by VITO BADALAMENTI, MARGARET BADALAMENTI.(FOTI, THOMAS)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABC CORPORATION # 1-10 (FICTITIOUS), MARGARET BADALAMENTI, VITO BADALAMENTI, JOHN DOE #1-10 (fictitious), MARGARET BADALAMENTI AND STEPHANINE MILNE, JOAN MILNE, STERLINGBROOK EQUINE, INC., STERLINGBROOK FARM, STERLINGBROOK FARM EVENTS LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jdb)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jdb)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STERLINGBROOK EQUINE, INC., STERLINGBROOK FARM EVENTS LLC, MARGARET BADALAMENTI AND STEPHANINE MILNE, JOAN MILNE, STERLINGBROOK FARM, MARGARET BADALAMENTI, VITO BADALAMENTI, JOHN DOE #1-10 (fictitious),ABC CORPORATION # 1-10 (FICTITIOUS).Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9796824) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARLA WITTER, JEFF WITTER.(ELLERY, MICHAEL) Modified on 7/9/2019 (jdb).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button.. Do NOT enter address information when entering parties. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WITTER et al v. STERLINGBROOK EQUINE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET BADALAMENTI AND STEPHANINE MILNE, INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A STERLINGBROOK FARM EVENTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STERLINGBROOK EQUINE, INC.
Represented By: GLENN D. CURVING
Represented By: ANNE M MOHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET BADALAMENTI
Represented By: THOMAS D. FOTI
Represented By: JAMES JOSEPH GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAN MILNE
Represented By: GLENN D. CURVING
Represented By: ANNE M MOHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STERLINGBROOK FARM EVENTS LLC
Represented By: JAMES JOSEPH GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VITO BADALAMENTI
Represented By: THOMAS D. FOTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION # 1-10 (FICTITIOUS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1-10 (fictitious)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STERLINGBROOK FARM
Represented By: GLENN D. CURVING
Represented By: ANNE M MOHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF WITTER
Represented By: MICHAEL E. ELLERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLA WITTER
Represented By: MICHAEL E. ELLERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: MARGARET BADALAMENTI AND STEPHANINE MILNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?