KIRKWOOD v. CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: BETTY JO KIRKWOOD
Defendant: CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMERICAN TALC COMPANY, METROPOLITAN TALC COMPANY, INC., CHARLES MATHIEU, INC., RESOURCE PROCESSORS, INC. AND WINDSOR MINERALS, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY, BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC, BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC., PFIZER INC., CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION, COTY, INC., CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON and JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50
Case Number: 3:2019cv14947
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #27 MOTION to Change Venue . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiffs request that Colgate's motion be adjourned to 10/07/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 09/05/2019. (jmh)
August 30, 2019 Filing 35 Letter from Robert E. Lytle, Esq. Requesting 1-Cycle Adjournment of Colgate's Motion to Change Venue re #32 Letter, #27 MOTION to Change Venue , #31 Letter, #28 Letter. (LYTLE, ROBERT)
August 27, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit)(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
August 27, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit)(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
August 21, 2019 Filing 32 Letter from Cyprus Amax Minerals Co. and Cyprus Mines Corp. re #27 MOTION to Change Venue . (MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
August 20, 2019 Filing 31 Letter from Coty, Inc. joining motion to transfer venue re #27 MOTION to Change Venue , #28 Letter. (MILLER, H.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 30 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph Mandia, #2 Exhibit Vol. I - Exs 1 to 11, #3 Exhibit Vol. II - Exs 12 to 14, #4 Exhibit Vol. III - Exs 15 to 16, #5 Exhibit Vol. IV - Ex 17, #6 Exhibit Vol. V - Exs 18-22)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
August 20, 2019 Filing 29 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph Mandia, #2 Exhibit Vol. 1 Exs 1 to 11, #3 Exhibit Vol. II - Exs 12 to 14, #4 Exhibit Vol. III - Exs 15 to 16, #5 Exhibit Vol. IV - Ex 17, #6 Exhibit Vol. 5 - Exs 18 to 22)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
August 20, 2019 Filing 28 Letter from Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.. (PATEL, POOJA)
August 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #27 MOTION to Change Venue . Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
August 19, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Change Venue by COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Brief ISO Motion to Change Venue, #2 Certification of Counsel ISO Motion to Change Venue, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J)(WEINER, STEVEN)
August 19, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WEINER, STEVEN)
August 16, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by COTY, INC..(MILLER, H.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 24 Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , First CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC..(PATEL, POOJA)
August 5, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #23 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/19/2019. (jem)
August 5, 2019 Filing 23 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Colgate-Palmolive Company. Attorney GARY D. VAN LIEU for COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY added. (WEINER, STEVEN)
August 5, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 9/3/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
August 5, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
August 2, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #20 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by COTY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/19/2019. (km)
August 2, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, when entering a first appearance in a case, counsel should add their name when prompted. The Clerks office has added H. Lockwood Miller, III as representing Coty, Inc. in this case. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (km)
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Coty, Inc... (MILLER, H.)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 02:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/26/19. (if, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by POOJA R. PATEL on behalf of WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC. (PATEL, POOJA)
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from Robert E. Lytle 7-18-19. (LYTLE, ROBERT)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by COTY, INC. of Consent to Removal (MILLER, H.)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Dana C. Simon, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/15/2019. (jem)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER directing Plaintiff's counsel to serve copies of any medical records in her possession on Defendants at least 5 days prior to the beginning of the deposition. Plaintiff's counsel is to immediately serve a copy of this Order on all Defendants by email, facsimile, or other means intended to provide prompt notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 07/12/2019. (jmh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from John C. McMeekin II. (MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Robert E. Lytle. (LYTLE, ROBERT)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Pooja R. Patel. (PATEL, POOJA)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Defendant Johnson & Johnson re #2 Letter. (WATSON, NATALIE)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Robert E. Lytle re PHV D. Simon. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Dana C. Simon, #2 Affidavit of Robert E. Lytle, #3 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order, #4 Certificate of Service of Robert E. Lytle)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Robert E. Lytle 7-12-19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Gary Van Lieu Esq.. (WEINER, STEVEN)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Letter. (MILLER, H.)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from John C. McMeekin II. (MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER that by no later than 11:00 a.m. 07/12/2019, Defendants are to file any objections to the Plaintiff's request for an in extremis deposition in her letter #2 . In the meantime, Plaintiff is to immediately submit a proposed form of order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 07/11/2019. (Gonzalez, P)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Robert E. Lytle to Judge Goodman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
July 11, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdb)
July 10, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: When entering parties make sure to add ALL plaintiffs and defendants as listed on the caption of the original complaint . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
July 10, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Counsel, Leah Kagan appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jjc, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMERICAN TALC COMPANY, METROPOLITAN TALC COMPANY, INC., CHARLES MATHIEU, INC., RESOURCE PROCESSORS, INC. AND WINDSOR MINERALS from Middlesex County Superior Court, case number L-5023-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9803435), filed by CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMERICAN TALC COMPANY, METROPOLITAN TALC COMPANY, INC., CHARLES MATHIEU, INC., RESOURCE PROCESSORS, INC. AND WINDSOR MINERALS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KIRKWOOD v. CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMERICAN TALC COMPANY, METROPOLITAN TALC COMPANY, INC., CHARLES MATHIEU, INC., RESOURCE PROCESSORS, INC. AND WINDSOR MINERALS
Represented By: JOHN CHRISTIE MCMEEKIN, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY
Represented By: GARY D. VAN LIEU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN CHRISTIE MCMEEKIN, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COTY, INC.
Represented By: H. LOCKWOOD MILLER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN CHRISTIE MCMEEKIN, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC.
Represented By: POOJA R. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY JO KIRKWOOD
Represented By: ROBERT E. LYTLE
Represented By: LEAH CYLIA KAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?