BARTLEY v. TRAVELERS, et al.
Plaintiff: MARJORIE BARTLEY
Defendant: LANTANA INSURANCE, LTD, TRAVELERS and LANTANA INSURANCE LTD.
Case Number: 3:2019cv15322
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4072
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) by LANTANA INSURANCE LTD.. Responses due by 9/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Declaration of Gene Y. Kang, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Gene Y. Kang, #4 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Gene Y. Kang, #5 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Gene Y. Kang, #6 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Gene Y. Kang, #7 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Gene Y. Kang, #8 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Gene Y. Kang, #9 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Gene Y. Kang, #10 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Gene Y. Kang, #11 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Gene Y. Kang, #12 Text of Proposed Order, #13 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER converting the Initial Conference scheduled for 9/24/19 at 3:00 p.m. to a Telephone Conference. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call at that time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/13/19. (if, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by MARJORIE BARTLEY (AMDUR, RICHARD)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tina L. Kappen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/5/2019. (km)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by TRAVELERS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PETITT, ADAM)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 03:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/26/19. (if, )
July 23, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tina L. Kappen. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tina L. Kappen by TRAVELERS. (PETITT, ADAM)
July 16, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by TRAVELERS & COASTAL AGENTS ALLIANCE, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/2/2019. (km)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Travelers.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(PETITT, ADAM)
July 16, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr, )
July 16, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: When entering parties make sure to add all plaintiffs and defendants as listed on the caption of the state court complaint. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
July 16, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Counsel for Plaintiff, Richard A. Amdur, Jr. appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jjc, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRAVELERS identifying Standard Fire Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PETITT, ADAM)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TRAVELERS from SCNJ Monmouth County, case number MON-L-3663-18., filed by TRAVELERS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B Part 1, #5 Exhibit B Part 2, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Supplement Pay.gov Payment Confirmation)(PETITT, ADAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARTLEY v. TRAVELERS, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARJORIE BARTLEY
Represented By: RICHARD A. AMDUR, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANTANA INSURANCE, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS
Represented By: ADAM JOSEPH PETITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANTANA INSURANCE LTD.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?