ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD v. AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. et al
Plaintiff: ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. and AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED
Case Number: 3:2019cv15437
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/30/2019. (jem)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's time to answer, move, or otherwise reply to Defendants' Counterclaims.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. identifying Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (YOUNGELSON, MARC)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 Aurobindo's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD by AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(YOUNGELSON, MARC)
August 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JAMES E. NEALON and STEVEN J. MOORE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steven J. Moore, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9902097.) (YOUNGELSON, MARC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James E. Nealon, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9902064.) (YOUNGELSON, MARC)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to James E. Nealon, Esq., and Steven J. Moore, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/15/2019. (jem)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission for James E. Nealon, Esq., and Steven J. Moore, Esq., for by AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James E. Nealon, Esq., #2 Certification Steven J. Moore, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(YOUNGELSON, MARC)
August 6, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/26/2019. (jem) Modified on 8/6/2019 (km).
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Aurobindo.. (YOUNGELSON, MARC)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC D. YOUNGELSON on behalf of All Defendants (YOUNGELSON, MARC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID LEIGH MOSES on behalf of ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD (MOSES, DAVID)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD (BATON, WILLIAM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 AO120 Patent Form filed. (jdb)
July 17, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9819615), filed by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD v. AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC.
Represented By: MARC D. YOUNGELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED
Represented By: MARC D. YOUNGELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: DAVID LEIGH MOSES
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?