CUBIST PHARMACEUTICALS LLC v. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CUBIST PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK, LLC and AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv15439
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Defendant on behalf of all Parties. (CONROY, REBEKAH)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney RAVIN R. PATEL terminated. (PATEL, RAVIN)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim by CUBIST PHARMACEUTICALS LLC.(FLAHERTY, JOHN)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/09/2019. (jem)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK, LLC, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. (CONROY, REBEKAH)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against CUBIST PHARMACEUTICALS LLC by AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK, LLC, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC.(CONROY, REBEKAH)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CUBIST PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CUBIST PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK, LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK, LLC, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 AO120 Patent Form filed. (abr, )
July 17, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by RAVIN R. PATEL on behalf of CUBIST PHARMACEUTICALS LLC (PATEL, RAVIN)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CUBIST PHARMACEUTICALS LLC identifying Merck & Co., Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK, LLC, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9820138), filed by CUBIST PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(FLAHERTY, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUBIST PHARMACEUTICALS LLC v. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CUBIST PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK, LLC
Represented By: REBEKAH R. CONROY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: REBEKAH R. CONROY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?