BILL KELLY JR MEMORIAL FUND, INC. v. BLACK CLOVER ENTERPRISES, LLC
Plaintiff: BILL KELLY JR MEMORIAL FUND, INC.
Defendant: BLACK CLOVER ENTERPRISES, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv15497
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the time for Defendant Black Clover Enterprises to respond to the Complaint until 9/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/29/2019. (eaj)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH ANN CARBONE on behalf of BLACK CLOVER ENTERPRISES, LLC (CARBONE, ELIZABETH)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID STANLEY GOLD on behalf of BLACK CLOVER ENTERPRISES, LLC (GOLD, DAVID)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from David S. Gold, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply)(GOLD, DAVID)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BILL KELLY JR MEMORIAL FUND, INC.. BLACK CLOVER ENTERPRISES, LLC served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (ROTH, STEPHEN)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BLACK CLOVER ENTERPRISES, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 AO120 Trademark Form filed. re; #1 Complaint (abr, )
July 18, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BILL KELLY JR MEMORIAL FUND, INC.. (ROTH, STEPHEN)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BLACK CLOVER ENTERPRISES, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9821917) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BILL KELLY JR MEMORIAL FUND, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROTH, STEPHEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BILL KELLY JR MEMORIAL FUND, INC. v. BLACK CLOVER ENTERPRISES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACK CLOVER ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: DAVID STANLEY GOLD
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN CARBONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILL KELLY JR MEMORIAL FUND, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN F. ROTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?