PIZARRO v. RUSSO
Appellant: PEDRO JUAN PIZARRO
Appellee: ALBERT RUSSO
Case Number: 3:2019cv15660
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Notice of Appeal in this matter be and the same is hereby dismissed under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8003 for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 9/16/2019. (jem)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to PEDRO JUAN PIZARRO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jdb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Letter Regarding Designation filed from Pedro Pizarro. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal) (jmh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-19677-CMG, filed by PEDRO JUAN PIZARRO. (Attachments: #1 Order Being Appealed, #2 Transmittal, #3 Certificate of Service)(jdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PIZARRO v. RUSSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PEDRO JUAN PIZARRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ALBERT RUSSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?