STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 148.74.118.238
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 148.74.118.238
Case Number: 3:2019cv16184
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 09/24/22019. (jmh)
September 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Greg Lansky, #3 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #4 Exhibit C -- Declaration of John S. Pasquale, #5 Exhibit D -- Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(ATKIN, JOHN)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 AO121 Copyright Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jdb)
July 31, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jdb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC identifying GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (ATKIN, JOHN)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 148.74.118.238 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9860000) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ATKIN, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 148.74.118.238
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 148.74.118.238
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: JOHN C. ATKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?