PALISADES SAFETY & INSURANCE ASSO v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: PALISADES SAFETY & INSURANCE ASSO aso RICHARD KOMOROSKI and PALISADES SAFETY & INSURANCE ASSO
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-3, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and JOHN DOE CORPORATION 1-3
Case Number: 3:2019cv16263
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 10/28/2019. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/29/2019. (gxh)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Settlement by PALISADES SAFETY & INSURANCE ASSO (PARSONS, JENNIFER)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
August 6, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
August 5, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number NEW040228 (sm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE 1-3, JOHN DOE CORPORATION 1-3, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by PALISADES SAFETY & INSURANCE ASSO aso RICHARD KOMOROSKI.(PARSONS, JENNIFER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PALISADES SAFETY & INSURANCE ASSO v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALISADES SAFETY & INSURANCE ASSO aso RICHARD KOMOROSKI
Represented By: JENNIFER L. PARSONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALISADES SAFETY & INSURANCE ASSO
Represented By: JENNIFER L. PARSONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATION 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?