MAESTOSO v. SPEEDWAY LLC
Plaintiff: ETTORE A. MAESTOSO
Defendant: SPEEDWAY GAS STATION, JANE ROE 1-10, JOHN DOE 1-10, ABC CORP. 1-10, DEF MAINTENANCE COMPANY 1-10, SPEEDWAY LLC and SPEEDWAY CONVENIENCE STORE
Case Number: 3:2019cv16277
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/26/2019. (ce3)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 1:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Telephone Status Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Any motion to Amend the Pleadings and/or Join New Parties due by 12/31/2019. Fact Discovery due by 3/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/26/2019. (jem)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SPEEDWAY CONVENIENCE STORE, SPEEDWAY GAS STATION, SPEEDWAY LLC.(LIU, FRANCIS)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPEEDWAY CONVENIENCE STORE, SPEEDWAY GAS STATION, SPEEDWAY LLC identifying speedway llc as Corporate Parent.. (LIU, FRANCIS)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov(ce3)
August 2, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Counsel, BRIAN THOMAS HORAN appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website atwww.njd.uscourts.govfor information and instructions on maintaining your account. (abr)
August 2, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
August 2, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: When entering parties make sure to add ALL plaintiffs and defendants as listed on the caption of the original state court complaint . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SPEEDWAY LLC from Ocean County Vicinage, case number OCN-L-389-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9865519), filed by SPEEDWAY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(LIU, FRANCIS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAESTOSO v. SPEEDWAY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ETTORE A. MAESTOSO
Represented By: BRIAN THOMAS HORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY GAS STATION
Represented By: FRANCIS KUANG LIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE ROE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF MAINTENANCE COMPANY 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY LLC
Represented By: FRANCIS KUANG LIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY CONVENIENCE STORE
Represented By: FRANCIS KUANG LIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?