SMITH et al v. HICKS et al
Plaintiff: NICOLE SMITH, AJAI SMITH, MR. CHAPPELL T. FLADGER and AMARE SMITH
Defendant: MR. M. SLAUGHTER, SARGENT EURE, OFFICER ING., OFFICER LEARY, MAILROOM OFFICERS, NEW MAILROOM SARGENT, OFFICER HYER, OFFICER D. GILLBERT and MR. MARCUS O. HICKS
Case Number: 3:2019cv16509
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 ***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (jem)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; the Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this case without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee; if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he shall notify the Court in writing, with a completed IFP application or filing fee, within 30 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/25/2019. (jem)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that no later than 10/11/2019 Plaintiffs are directed to resubmit their Complaint, and only their Complaint to the Court. The Complaint should include a proper caption that identifies all named Plaintiffs. Further, the Complaint submitted should include all of Plaintiffs' allegations in that single document, along with signatures of all listed Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 09/05/2019. (jmh)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to AJAI SMITH (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (abr)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Letter submission from MR. CHAPPELL T. FLADGER. (jem)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Letter submission from MR. CHAPPELL T. FLADGER. (jem)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Letter submission from CHAPPELL T. FLADGER. (jem)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Letter request to proceed in forma pauperis from CHAPPELL T. FLADGER. (jem) Modified on 8/19/2019 (eaj).
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Letter submission from Plaintiffs regarding case and conditions within Correctional Housing. (jem)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT AND REGISTRATION TO RECEIVE NEF by CHAPPELL T. FLADGER (abr)
August 9, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #1 Complaint filed by CHAPPELL T. FLADGER on 8/9/2019 does not list the signing Pro Se Party as a Plaintiff in the Case Caption. The Clerks Office has added CHAPPELL T. FLADGER. to the caption of the case. The listed Captioned Plaintiffs did not sign the Complaint. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Complaint with the proper caption and signatures. This message shall remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (abr)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Application IFP, #5 Consent & Registration For to Recieve Documents Electronically, #6 Envelope)(abr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH et al v. HICKS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. M. SLAUGHTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARGENT EURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER ING.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER LEARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAILROOM OFFICERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW MAILROOM SARGENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER HYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER D. GILLBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. MARCUS O. HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJAI SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MR. CHAPPELL T. FLADGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMARE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?