BENNETTE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: John D Bennette and JOHN D. BENNETTE
Defendant: Andrew M Saul and COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 3:2019cv16558
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN D. BENNETTE. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt)(JONES, DANIEL)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
August 13, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti added. (jdb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John D Bennette. (JONES, DANIEL)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9885591), filed by John D Bennette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(JONES, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BENNETTE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Bennette
Represented By: DANIEL SYLVESTER JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN D. BENNETTE
Represented By: DANIEL SYLVESTER JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?