FUHRER v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PHILIP FUHRER
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC, TRANS UNION LLC, BANK OF AMERICA N.A., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, TRANS UNION, LLC, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. and EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv16599
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC Only by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC (KLEIN, JONATHAN)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting application for extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1(B). Response due 10/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 09/27/2019. (jmh)
September 26, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #25 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. has been DENIED. The Clerk has previously granted the application for an extension of time to answer on 9/11/2019. This request has been forwarded to chambers. (jem)
September 25, 2019 Filing 25 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Bank of America, N.A... (BLAINE, MICHAEL)
September 24, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC identifying Ocwen Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (GORDON, BENJAMIN)
September 24, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GORDON, BENJAMIN)
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with separate defenses by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(KOWAL, DOROTHY)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 2:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 9/16/2019. (jem)
September 16, 2019 This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni to Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise advised by Judge Quraishi's chambers, all conferences set by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni shall be conducted by Judge Quraishi on the previously scheduled date and time. (jjc, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHILIP FUHRER. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
September 11, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #18 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/25/2019. (jem)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Bank of America, N.A... (BLAINE, MICHAEL)
September 11, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #17 Application for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Michael E. Blaine, Esq. on 9/11/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE application USING Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. The Clerks office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (BLAINE, MICHAEL)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (BLAINE, MICHAEL)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. BLAINE on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (BLAINE, MICHAEL)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHILIP FUHRER. TRANS UNION, LLC served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHILIP FUHRER. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHILIP FUHRER. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
September 10, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/24/2019. (jem)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Attorney BENJAMIN EVAN GORDON for OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC added. (GORDON, BENJAMIN)
September 9, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/24/2019. (km)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC identifying Equifax Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KLEIN, JONATHAN)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Equifax Information Services LLC. Attorney JONATHAN DANIEL KLEIN for EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC added. (KLEIN, JONATHAN)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 TRANS UNION, LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by TRANS UNION, LLC.(BROWN, WILLIAM)
September 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHILIP FUHRER. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
August 26, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/24/2019. (jem)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. identifying experian plc as Corporate Parent.. (KOWAL, DOROTHY)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Experian Information Solutions Inc. Attorney DOROTHY A. KOWAL for EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. added. (KOWAL, DOROTHY)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANS UNION, LLC. (BROWN, WILLIAM)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM ROBERT BROWN on behalf of TRANS UNION, LLC (BROWN, WILLIAM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, TRANS UNION, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
August 14, 2019 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BANK OF AMERICA N.A., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC, TRANS UNION LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9888440) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PHILIP FUHRER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SAKS, YAAKOV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FUHRER v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: DOROTHY A. KOWAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: BENJAMIN EVAN GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM ROBERT BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BLAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: JONATHAN DANIEL KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP FUHRER
Represented By: YAAKOV SAKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?