PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP INS. CO. A/S/O PATRICIA PENIX v. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP INS. CO. A/S/O PATRICIA PENIX and PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv16663
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT ORDER extending time of Defendant ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. to answer, move or otherwise reply to Plaintiff's Complaint to 10/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/09/2019. (jdb)
October 8, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer #4 filed by WILFRED P. CORONATO on 10/08/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. For future reference, this should be filed as a letter because it isn't requesting an extension from the Clerk. This request has been sent to chambers. (jdb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney WILFRED P. CORONATO for ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. added. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Hon. Zahid N. Quraishi)(CORONATO, WILFRED)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
August 15, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP INS. CO. A/S/O PATRICIA PENIX. (CRAWFORD, DENNIS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9892076), filed by PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP INS. CO. A/S/O PATRICIA PENIX.(CRAWFORD, DENNIS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP INS. CO. A/S/O PATRICIA PENIX v. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP INS. CO. A/S/O PATRICIA PENIX
Represented By: DENNIS J. CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DENNIS J. CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: WILFRED P. CORONATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?