PARK PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION v. FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL MIDATLANTIC, LLC
Plaintiff: PARK PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION
Defendant: FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL MIDATLANTIC, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv16810
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting refund of fees. Signed by Chief Deputy Theresa L. Burnnett on 9/9/2019. (mps)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Application for Refund of Fees from Plaintiff re #1 Complaint, (finance notified).. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(LANGE, KIERSTIN)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PARK PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL MIDATLANTIC, LLC waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LANGE, KIERSTIN)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL MIDATLANTIC, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
August 19, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL MIDATLANTIC, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9900497) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PARK PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6)(LANGE, KIERSTIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARK PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION v. FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL MIDATLANTIC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL MIDATLANTIC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARK PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION
Represented By: KIERSTIN MARIE LANGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?