CUCCIO v. THE HOME DEPOT USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: AMY CUCCIO
Defendant: KIM VIGNOLA, THE HOME DEPOT, INC., THE HOME DEPOT USA, INC. and HOME DEPOT SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv16988
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
2 Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by CLARA H. RHO on behalf of THE HOME DEPOT USA, INC., HOME DEPOT SERVICES, LLC, THE HOME DEPOT, INC., KIM VIGNOLA (RHO, CLARA)
October 8, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by KIM VIGNOLA, HOME DEPOT SERVICES, LLC, THE HOME DEPOT USA, INC., THE HOME DEPOT, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/26/2019. (jem)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney PATRICK G. BRADY for THE HOME DEPOT USA, INC.,PATRICK G. BRADY for HOME DEPOT SERVICES, LLC,PATRICK G. BRADY for THE HOME DEPOT, INC.,PATRICK G. BRADY for KIM VIGNOLA added. (BRADY, PATRICK)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE HOME DEPOT USA, INC., HOME DEPOT SERVICES, LLC, THE HOME DEPOT, INC.. (BRADY, PATRICK)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMY CUCCIO. KIM VIGNOLA waiver sent on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMY CUCCIO. THE HOME DEPOT, INC. waiver sent on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMY CUCCIO. HOME DEPOT SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMY CUCCIO. THE HOME DEPOT USA, INC. waiver sent on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael A. Shipp for all further proceedings. Judge Brian R. Martinotti no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/3/2019. (jjc, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE HOME DEPOT USA, INC., HOME DEPOT SERVICES, LLC, THE HOME DEPOT, INC., KIM VIGNOLA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
August 21, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (jdb)
August 21, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE HOME DEPOT USA, INC., HOME DEPOT SERVICES, LLC, HOME DEPOT SERVICES, LLC, KIM VIGNOLA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9907406) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AMY CUCCIO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SMITH, CATHERINE) Modified on 8/21/2019 (jdb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUCCIO v. THE HOME DEPOT USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM VIGNOLA
Represented By: CLARA H. RHO
Represented By: PATRICK G. BRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HOME DEPOT, INC.
Represented By: CLARA H. RHO
Represented By: PATRICK G. BRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HOME DEPOT USA, INC.
Represented By: CLARA H. RHO
Represented By: PATRICK G. BRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: CLARA H. RHO
Represented By: PATRICK G. BRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY CUCCIO
Represented By: CATHERINE WELLINGTON SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?