CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140 v.RIDES RESOURCES INC. et al
Plaintiff: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140
Defendant: RIDE RESOURCES DBA RIDES 4 U, INC., RIDES 4U, INC., RIDE RESOURCES, INC., VIRO ENGINEERING BV, KMG INTERNATIONAL BV, ALBERT KROON, JOHN DOES 1-10, NEW RIDES EUROPE, RIDE LYNX, LLC, ABC COMPANIES 1-10, XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-20, RIDES RESOURCES INC. and ROBERT TUCKER
Case Number: 3:2019cv17475
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Support filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140 re #21 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Robert L. Lakind, Esq., #2 Certificate of Service)(LAKIND, ROBERT)
October 15, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140. All Defendants. (LAKIND, ROBERT)
October 7, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by RIDE RESOURCES, INC., RIDES 4U, INC., RIDES RESOURCES INC. re #21 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Index C)(PIANTINO, PAUL)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that Defendants' #8 Motion to Dismiss is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED pending adjudication of the Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 09/30/2019. (jmh)
September 30, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert has been converted to a telephone status conference. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for setting up and initiating the call. (ce3)
September 25, 2019 Filing 25 Letter from Paul Piantino III. (PIANTINO, PAUL)
September 24, 2019 Filing 24 Letter from Robert L. Lakind. (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 24, 2019 Filing 23 Letter from Robert L. Lakind. (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 19, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by RIDE RESOURCES, INC., RIDES 4U, INC., RIDES RESOURCES INC. re #21 MOTION to Remand (PIANTINO, PAUL)
September 12, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Robert Lakind with Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 11, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the #18 Summons Issued filed by the Clerk's office on 09/11/2019 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (jmh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KMG INTERNATIONAL BV, ALBERT KROON, NEW RIDES EUROPE, RIDE LYNX, LLC, ROBERT TUCKER, VIRO ENGINEERING BV. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 Request for Summons to be Issued by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140 as to RIDE LYNX, LLC. (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KMG INTERNATIONAL BV, ALBERT KROON, NEW RIDES EUROPE, VIRO ENGINEERING BV. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 Request for Summons to be Issued by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140 as to ROBERT TUCKER. (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Summons to be Issued by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140 as to VIRO ENGINEERING BV. (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Summons to be Issued by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140 as to NEW RIDES EUROPE. (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Summons to be Issued by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140 as to ALBERT KROON. (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Summons to be Issued by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140 as to KMG INTERNATIONAL BV. (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Robert Lakind, Esq.. (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 6, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Robert Lakind re Due Diligence by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140. (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Exhibit to #8 Motion to Dismiss, EXHIBIT E to MOTION by RIDE RESOURCES, INC., RIDES 4U, INC., RIDES RESOURCES INC.. (PIANTINO, PAUL)
September 5, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by RIDE RESOURCES, INC., RIDES 4U, INC., RIDES RESOURCES INC.. Responses due by 9/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certification, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D)(PIANTINO, PAUL)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140. (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140. (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140. (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT E. LYTLE on behalf of CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140 (LYTLE, ROBERT)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT LAWRENCE LAKIND on behalf of CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140 (LAKIND, ROBERT)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov(ce3)
August 30, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (eaj, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RIDE RESOURCES DBA RIDES 4 U, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, case number SOM-L-969-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9931534), filed by RIDE RESOURCES DBA RIDES 4 U, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification Cert of Service, #3 Exhibit A)(PIANTINO, PAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140 v.RIDES RESOURCES INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO INSURANCE POLICY NO. MKC00140
Represented By: ROBERT LAWRENCE LAKIND
Represented By: ROBERT E. LYTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIDE RESOURCES DBA RIDES 4 U, INC.
Represented By: JAMES D. BURGER
Represented By: PAUL PIANTINO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIDES 4U, INC.
Represented By: PAUL PIANTINO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIDE RESOURCES, INC.
Represented By: PAUL PIANTINO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRO ENGINEERING BV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMG INTERNATIONAL BV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERT KROON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW RIDES EUROPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIDE LYNX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIDES RESOURCES INC.
Represented By: JAMES D. BURGER
Represented By: PAUL PIANTINO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT TUCKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?