KUPERSMIT v. IRS/CIR et al
Plaintiff: BARBARA A. KUPERSMIT
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, COMMONWEALTH BUREAU OF INDIVIDUAL TAXES, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY, VERIZON, WELLS FARGO BANK, IRS/CIR and CITIZENS BANK
Case Number: 3:2019cv17580
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.. Responses due by 11/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #3 Index Table of Contents, #4 Index Table of Authorities, #5 Brief Memorandum of Law, #6 Certification Certification of Counsel, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C, #10 Proof of Service)(MARTIN, WILLIAM)
October 31, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/2/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by CITIZENS BANK. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BETTINO, DIANE)
October 28, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CITIZENS BANK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/29/2019. (abr)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Citizens Bank.. (BETTINO, DIANE)
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE A. BETTINO on behalf of CITIZENS BANK (BETTINO, DIANE)
October 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY identifying State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (PINDULIC, ROBERT)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 11/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(PINDULIC, ROBERT)
October 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Entry of Default and Summary Judgment. Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default and Summary Judgment by BARBARA A. KUPERSMIT. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts, #2 Envelope)(jem)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Abuse of Process by BARBARA A. KUPERSMIT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jem)
October 23, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice. Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice by WELLS FARGO BANK. Responses due by 11/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Aaron M. Bender, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(BENDER, AARON)
October 8, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WELLS FARGO BANK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/22/2019. (jmh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (BENDER, AARON)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON M. BENDER on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK (BENDER, AARON)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Copy of Letter regarding an Appeal Notice to the Department of the Treasury from Barbara A. Kupersmit and Harold P. Kupersmit. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jem)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Copy of Declaratory Judgment sent to U.S. Supreme Court from Barbara A. Kupersmit and Harold P. Kupersmit. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jem)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Submission received by BARBARA A. KUPERSMIT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jdb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, CITIZENS BANK, COMMONWEALTH BUREAU OF INDIVIDUAL TAXES, IRS/CIR, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY, VERIZON, WELLS FARGO BANK. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
September 16, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number TRE105870 (abr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed BARBARA A. KUPERSMIT. (jem)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. Sent via USPS on 9/4/2019. (jdb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope)(jdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KUPERSMIT v. IRS/CIR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH BUREAU OF INDIVIDUAL TAXES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: WILLIAM JOSEPH MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT T. PINDULIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK
Represented By: AARON M. BENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS/CIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZENS BANK
Represented By: DIANE A. BETTINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA A. KUPERSMIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?