TORRES v. MONMOUTH COUNTY CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION et al
Plaintiff: ANGELO TORRES
Defendant: MONMOUTH COUNTY, ROGER BREMEKAMP, JOHN DOE CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 1-10, MONMOUTH COUNTY CORR. INST., ACTING WARDEN MCCI BARRY NADROWSKI, JOHN DOE COUNTY EMPLOYEES 1-10 and CORRECTION OFFICER Aleksandrs Urjans
Case Number: 3:2019cv17704
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATED CONSENT ORDER that the time within which Defendants' shall, answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through and including 11/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/23/2019. (jmh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ANGELO TORRES against defendant Bremekamp (Attachments: #1 Summons Proof of Service)(MORIARTY, CHARLES)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACTING WARDEN BARRY NADROWSKI, ROGER BREMEKAMP, CORRECTIONS OFFICER ALEKSANDRS URJANS, COUNTY OF MONMOUTH, JOHN DOE CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 1-10, JOHN DOE COUNTY EMPLOYEES 1-10, MONMOUTH COUNTY CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
September 9, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jdb)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9945520) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ANGELO TORRES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MORIARTY, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TORRES v. MONMOUTH COUNTY CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONMOUTH COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER BREMEKAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONMOUTH COUNTY CORR. INST.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTING WARDEN MCCI BARRY NADROWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE COUNTY EMPLOYEES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTION OFFICER Aleksandrs Urjans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELO TORRES
Represented By: CHARLES M. MORIARTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?