AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW JERSEY et al v. GREWAL et al
Plaintiff: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, INC. and AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW JERSEY
Defendant: MARGUERITE T. SIMON, STEPHEN M. HOLDEN, GURBIR S. GREWAL and ERIC H. JASO
Case Number: 3:2019cv17807
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT ORDER that all deadlines in this matter are held in abeyance pending further order of the Court; Defendants shall submit a status report by 12/20/2019, with a proposed schedule on how this matter should proceed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/08/2019. (jem)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT ORDER that the Act is preliminarily enjoined insofar as it imposes any legal requirement on any independent expenditure committee, including the ACLU Plaintiffs and their employees or agents; Should Defendants seek to end the preliminary injunction, they shall notify the ACLU Plaintiffs; Nothing in the consent order prevents further action by the Legislature or ELEC, as described by the Court in the Opinion in AFP, or enforcement of any rules promulgated by ELEC. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/23/2019. (jem)
October 20, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, WILLIAM F. CAVANAUGH, GREGORY MARGOLIS, JACOB J. PERKOWSKI, MICHAEL D. SCHWARTZ and STEPHANIE TEPLIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
October 18, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stephanie Teplin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LOCICERO, JEANNE)
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael D. Schwartz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LOCICERO, JEANNE)
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jacob J. Perkowski to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LOCICERO, JEANNE)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Gregory Margolis to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LOCICERO, JEANNE)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William F. Cavanaugh, Jr. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LOCICERO, JEANNE)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brian Hauss to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LOCICERO, JEANNE)
October 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, BRIAN HAUSS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
October 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to William F. Cavanaugh, Gregory Margolis, Jacob J. Perkowski, Michael D. Schwartz, and Stephanie Teplin: $ 750, receipt number TRE106794 (abr)
October 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to David Cole: $ 150, receipt number TRE106701 (abr)
October 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Brian Hauss: $ 150, receipt number TRE106702 (abr)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW JERSEY, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, INC.. All Defendants. (LOCICERO, JEANNE)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM BLAKE MASEF on behalf of All Defendants (MASEF, ADAM)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by STUART MARK FEINBLATT on behalf of All Defendants (FEINBLATT, STUART)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William F. Cavanaugh, Jr., Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/26/2019. (jem)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brian Hauss, Esq., Gregory Margolis, Esq., Jacob J. Perkowski, Esq., Michael D. Schwartz, Esq. and Stephanie Teplin, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/26/2019. (jem)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , William F. Cavanaugh, Jr. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William F. Cavanaugh, Jr. In Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Certification of Jeanne LoCicero in Support of Application of William F. Cavanaugh, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LOCICERO, JEANNE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David Douglas Cole In Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Certification of Brian Hauss In Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Certification of Gregory Margolis in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #4 Certification of Jacob J. Perkowski in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #5 Certification of Michael D. Schwartz in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #6 Certification of Stephanie Teplin In Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #7 Certification of Jeanne LoCicero In Support of Application of David Douglas Cole to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #8 Certification of Jeanne LoCicero In Support of Application of Brian Hauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #9 Certification of Jeanne LoCicero In Support of Application of Gregory Margolis to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #10 Certification of Jeanne LoCicero In Support of Application of Jacob J. Perkowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #11 Certification of Jeanne LoCicero In Support of Application of Michael D. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #12 Certification of Jeanne LoCicero In Support of Application of Stephanie Teplin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(LOCICERO, JEANNE)
September 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , William F. Cavanaugh, Jr.. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
September 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER - This matter will be held in abeyance until the Court has rendered a decision on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending in Americans for Prosperity v. Grewal, 3:19-cv-14228. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 9/17/19. (Fiore, J)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Jeanne LoCicero to Hon. Brian R. Martinotti, U.S.D.J., regarding case management conference in 3:19-cv-17912. (LOCICERO, JEANNE)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JEANNE LOCICERO on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LOCICERO, JEANNE)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW JERSEY, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, INC. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Gibbons P.C. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GURBIR S. GREWAL, STEPHEN M. HOLDEN, ERIC H. JASO, MARGUERITE T. SIMON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
September 11, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW JERSEY, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, INC. identifying none as Corporate Parent.. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GURBIR S. GREWAL, STEPHEN M. HOLDEN, ERIC H. JASO, MARGUERITE T. SIMON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9951800), filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW JERSEY, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification pursuant to Local Civil Rule 11.2, #2 Certification pursuant to Local Civil Rule 201.1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW JERSEY et al v. GREWAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, INC.
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Represented By: JEANNE LOCICERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Represented By: JEANNE LOCICERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGUERITE T. SIMON
Represented By: STUART MARK FEINBLATT
Represented By: ADAM BLAKE MASEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN M. HOLDEN
Represented By: STUART MARK FEINBLATT
Represented By: ADAM BLAKE MASEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURBIR S. GREWAL
Represented By: STUART MARK FEINBLATT
Represented By: ADAM BLAKE MASEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC H. JASO
Represented By: STUART MARK FEINBLATT
Represented By: ADAM BLAKE MASEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?