SHARIAH v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: NAKEEM SHARIAH
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2019cv17828
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 17-25 (BRM), filed by NAKEEM SHARIAH. (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit, #2 Envelope)(jem)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this case, without filing the motion; if Petitioner wishes to reopen this case, he shall so notify the Court within 30 days of the date of entry of this Memorandum and Order; upon receipt of a writing from Petitioner stating that he wishes to reopen this case, and a complete, signed motion, the Clerk of the Court will be directed to reopen this case. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 9/17/2019. (jem)
September 10, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono by NAKEEM SHARIAH. (jdb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 3:17-CR-00025-BRM, filed by NAKEEM SHARIAH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHARIAH v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ROBERT L. FRAZER
Represented By: NICHOLAS PAUL GRIPPO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NAKEEM SHARIAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?