AABDOLLAH v. FIRSTENERGY CORP. et al
Plaintiff: MORTEZA AABDOLLAH
Defendant: ONE EXCHANGE and FIRSTENERGY CORP.
Case Number: 3:2019cv17851
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Motions and Arguments re #10 RESPONSE in Support filed by ONE EXCHANGE (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jdb)
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by NIPUN JASHBHAI PATEL on behalf of ONE EXCHANGE (PATEL, NIPUN)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Support filed by ONE EXCHANGE re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (FEINSTEIN, DANA)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 Letter requesting oral presentation for 10/21/2019 from Morteza Aabdollah. (jdb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Defendant's Answer to Complaint and Separate Defenses re #5 Answer to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jdb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Defendant's Motion filed by MORTEZA AABDOLLAH re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (jdb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2019: #1 Envelope) (jdb).
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FIRSTENERGY CORP. re #5 Answer to Complaint, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) (BERUTTI, RONALD)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIRSTENERGY CORP. identifying FirstEnergy Corp. as Corporate Parent.. (BERUTTI, RONALD)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Separate Defenses by FIRSTENERGY CORP..(BERUTTI, RONALD)
September 17, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by ONE EXCHANGE. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FEINSTEIN, DANA)
September 16, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by FIRSTENERGY CORP. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/01/2019. (jem)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to FirstEnergy Corp... (BERUTTI, RONALD)
September 11, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Notice of Removal and attachments served on plaintiff Morteza Aabdollah on 09/11/2019, filed by FIRSTENERGY CORP.. (BERUTTI, RONALD)
September 11, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: When entering party information remember to change the party role to the correct designation. Plaintiff was added as a Defendant. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FIRSTENERGY CORP. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Special Civil Part, case number HNT-DC-1205-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9953143), filed by FIRSTENERGY CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaing, #2 Exhibit B Settlement Agreement)(BERUTTI, RONALD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AABDOLLAH v. FIRSTENERGY CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE EXCHANGE
Represented By: NIPUN JASHBHAI PATEL
Represented By: DANA ELIZABETH FEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRSTENERGY CORP.
Represented By: RONALD A. BERUTTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MORTEZA AABDOLLAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?