MOYER v. MERCER GROUP INTERNATIONAL OF NJ, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ELVIRA MOYER
Defendant: MERCER GROUP INTERNATIONAL OF NJ, INC. and RICHARD LODGEK
Case Number: 3:2019cv17922
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for 12/3/2019 02:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/24/2019. (jdb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCER GROUP INTERNATIONAL OF NJ, INC.. (HARDCASTLE, LARRY)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(HARDCASTLE, LARRY)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RICHARD LODGEK, MERCER GROUP INTERNATIONAL OF NJ, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
September 12, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jdb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RICHARD LODGEK, MERCER GROUP INTERNATIONAL OF NJ, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9957999) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ELVIRA MOYER.(DELGAIZO, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOYER v. MERCER GROUP INTERNATIONAL OF NJ, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELVIRA MOYER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER JOHN DELGAIZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCER GROUP INTERNATIONAL OF NJ, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD LODGEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?