JACKSON et al v. NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA JACKSON and RODNEY JACKSON
Defendant: JOHN DOE I-X, GEORGE ROBINSON, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, JANE DOE I-X, ABC, INC. and NORTHERN STATE PRISON
Case Number: 3:2019cv17943
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from DAG Niccole L. Sandora on Behalf of Defendants Department of Corrections and Northern State Prison Regarding Parties Joint Request for an Adjournment of the 11-26-19 Scheduling Conference and Defendants' Consent to Plaintiff's Request for an Adjournment of Defendants' Motion. (SANDORA, NICCOLE)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH AUSTIN BURKE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BURKE, JOSEPH)
October 31, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion set for 12/2/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, NORTHERN STATE PRISON. Responses due by 11/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certification, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(SANDORA, NICCOLE)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for 11/26/2019 02:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/10/2019. (jdb)
October 9, 2019 This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert to Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise advised by Judge Quraishi's chambers, all conferences set by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert shall be conducted by Judge Quraishi on the previously scheduled date and time. (jjc, )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER granting a 30-day extension of time to answer, move or otherwise reply to the complaint filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 09/26/2019. (jdb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SANDORA, NICCOLE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney KAI WENDELL MARSHALL-OTTO terminated. Attorney NICCOLE L. SANDORA for NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS,NICCOLE L. SANDORA for NORTHERN STATE PRISON added.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SANDORA, NICCOLE)
September 15, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to BRUCE P. FROMER re mandatory eFiling. (jem)
September 15, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NORTHERN STATE PRISON has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/03/2019. (jem)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to New Jersey Department of Corrections and Northern State Prison.. (MARSHALL-OTTO, KAI)
September 13, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (dm )
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, NORTHERN STATE PRISON from Monmouth County Superior Court, case number MON-L-2655-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9959048), filed by NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, NORTHERN STATE PRISON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Service)(MARSHALL-OTTO, KAI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON et al v. NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: KAI WENDELL MARSHALL-OTTO
Represented By: NICCOLE L. SANDORA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHERN STATE PRISON
Represented By: KAI WENDELL MARSHALL-OTTO
Represented By: NICCOLE L. SANDORA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA JACKSON
Represented By: BRUCE P. FROMER
Represented By: JOSEPH AUSTIN BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY JACKSON
Represented By: BRUCE P. FROMER
Represented By: JOSEPH AUSTIN BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?