BRISCO v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: LARISSA BRISCO
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 3:2019cv18018
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 Letter. (DUBIN, JON)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 Administrative Record Filed - Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13, #13 Part 14, #14 Part 15, #15 Part 16, #16 Part 17, #17 Part 18, #18 Part 19)(GRIFFIN, DINA)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DINA WHITE GRIFFIN on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (GRIFFIN, DINA)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by LARISSA BRISCO.(DUBIN, JON)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem)
September 18, 2019 COMPLAINT filed; see docket entry #1 . (jem)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order that Plaintiff is permitted to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs or security therefor; the Clerk shall file the Complaint with prepayment of the filing fee. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/18/2019. (jem)
September 17, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The summonses issued 9/16/19 were issued in error as the IFP application has not been decided yet. Please disregard. (abr)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
September 16, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson added. (abr)
September 16, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Counsel entered JPML #2738. JPML #2738 should only be used when opening short form complaints for MDL 2738. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by LARISSA BRISCO. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DUBIN, JON) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (abr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRISCO v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: DINA WHITE GRIFFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARISSA BRISCO
Represented By: JON C. DUBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?