STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 3:2019cv18036
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER granting request for a three-week extension of time to 12/03/2019, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/13/2019. (jmh)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Defendant Requesting Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. (MILLENKY, SUSAN)
October 16, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/12/2019. (jmh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney SUSAN R MILLENKY for UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION added. (MILLENKY, SUSAN)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL re #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (MORAMARCO, GLENN)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Exhibit to #1 Complaint , Civil Cover Sheet, by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL. (MORAMARCO, GLENN)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
September 17, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jdb)
September 17, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number TRE105928 (abr)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (MORAMARCO, GLENN)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (MORAMARCO, GLENN)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (MORAMARCO, GLENN)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (MORAMARCO, GLENN)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Filing and Admin fee $ 400), filed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibits)(MORAMARCO, GLENN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW JERSEY, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: GLENN J. MORAMARCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: SUSAN R MILLENKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?