WHITTEN et al v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Plaintiff: DOROTHY WHITTEN and MELVIN WHITTEN
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME, MCKESSON CORP., MERCK, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. and MERCK & CO., INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv18188
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Eastern District of Pennsylvania as case 2:19-cv-20290, filed 10/07/2019. (dm)
October 7, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the USDC for the EDPA. (dm )
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-43) transferring case to the USDC for the EDPA. (dm )
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MCKESSON CORP., MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
September 23, 2019 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jdb)
September 23, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MCKESSON CORP., MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9978919) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DOROTHY WHITTEN, MELVIN WHITTEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Summons MERCK SUMMONS, #3 Summons MSD SUMMONS, #4 Summons MCKESSON SUMONS)(CORDNER, MARGARET) Modified on 9/23/2019 (jdb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITTEN et al v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY WHITTEN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELVIN WHITTEN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?