PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC. et al v. NOVO NORDISK INC. et al
Plaintiff: FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C. and PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.
Defendant: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK INC. and SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S., LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv18326
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Charles F. Barret: $ 150, receipt number TRE107611 (mg)
November 14, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #18 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S., LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/09/2019. (jmh)
November 14, 2019 Filing 18 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants.. (GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL)
November 14, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 12/16/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dianne M. Nast, #2 Declaration of Charles F. Barrett, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(NAST, DIANNE)
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL R. MCDONALD on behalf of NOVO NORDISK INC. (MCDONALD, MICHAEL)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Richard R. Barrett Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/17/2019. (jmh)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from Michael R. Griffinger to the Honorable Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Griffinger, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration of James P. Rouhandeh, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Declaration of Neal A. Potischman, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Declaration of David B. Toscano, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 Declaration of Andrew Yaphe, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL) Modified on 10/9/2019 (sm,).
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by CALVIN KUSHNIR MAY on behalf of NOVO NORDISK INC. (MAY, CALVIN)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL ISAAC PORTNOY on behalf of NOVO NORDISK INC. (PORTNOY, SAMUEL)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER T. WALSH on behalf of NOVO NORDISK INC. (WALSH, CHRISTOPHER)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL R. GRIFFINGER on behalf of NOVO NORDISK INC. (GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C.. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S., LLC waiver sent on 9/26/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NAST, DIANNE)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C.. NOVO NORDISK INC. waiver sent on 9/26/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NAST, DIANNE)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C.. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY waiver sent on 9/26/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NAST, DIANNE)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Status Conference held on 9/27/2019. (lr, )
September 27, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dianne M. Nast, #2 Declaration of Richard R. Barrett, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(NAST, DIANNE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.. (NAST, DIANNE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C.. (NAST, DIANNE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK INC., PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S., LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
September 25, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr)
September 25, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9987747) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Professional Drug Company, Inc., FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(NAST, DIANNE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC. et al v. NOVO NORDISK INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FWK HOLDINGS, L.L.C.
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROFESSIONAL DRUG COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: DIANNE M. NAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVO NORDISK INC.
Represented By: CALVIN KUSHNIR MAY
Represented By: SAMUEL ISAAC PORTNOY
Represented By: MICHAEL R. GRIFFINGER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER T. WALSH
Represented By: MICHAEL R. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?