O'BRIEN et al v. MEADOWS FOUNDATION, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ALLISON O'BRIEN and NEVIN OLSON
Defendant: SUE ANN DERKACH, NAT CLYMER, MEADOWS FOUNDATION, INC., THE TOWNSHIP OF FRANKLIN, ROBERT METTLER, THERESA THORSON, JOANNA ROSE, JANET STEINHAUER and JOHN/JANE DOES #1-12
Case Number: 3:2019cv18626
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jmh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal and Proof of Service by ALLISON O'BRIEN, NEVIN OLSON (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Proof of Service)(MARTINDELL, ROGER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN PETER TRELEASE on behalf of THE TOWNSHIP OF FRANKLIN (TRELEASE, BRIAN)
October 8, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by THE TOWNSHIP OF FRANKLIN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/23/2019. (jmh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Township of Franklin.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(TRELEASE, BRIAN)
October 8, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NAT CLYMER, JANET STEINHAUER, THERESA THORSON, ROBERT METTLER, SUE ANN DERKACH, JOANNA ROSE, MEADOWS FOUNDATION, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/23/2019. (jmh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (DALENA, ANNE)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi in Courtroom 7W. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/04/2019. (jmh)
October 3, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NAT CLYMER, SUE ANN DERKACH, MEADOWS FOUNDATION, INC., ROBERT METTLER, JOANNA ROSE, JANET STEINHAUER, THERESA THORSON. (DONOVAN, KEVIN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NAT CLYMER, JANET STEINHAUER, THERESA THORSON, ROBERT METTLER, SUE ANN DERKACH, JOANNA ROSE, MEADOWS FOUNDATION, INC. from Somerset, case number SOM-1100-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10007743), filed by NAT CLYMER, JANET STEINHAUER, THERESA THORSON, ROBERT METTLER, SUE ANN DERKACH, JOANNA ROSE, MEADOWS FOUNDATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Filing, #2 Exhibit A to C)(DONOVAN, KEVIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'BRIEN et al v. MEADOWS FOUNDATION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUE ANN DERKACH
Represented By: ANNE M. DALENA
Represented By: KEVIN C. DONOVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAT CLYMER
Represented By: ANNE M. DALENA
Represented By: KEVIN C. DONOVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEADOWS FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: ANNE M. DALENA
Represented By: KEVIN C. DONOVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TOWNSHIP OF FRANKLIN
Represented By: BRIAN PETER TRELEASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT METTLER
Represented By: ANNE M. DALENA
Represented By: KEVIN C. DONOVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESA THORSON
Represented By: ANNE M. DALENA
Represented By: KEVIN C. DONOVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANNA ROSE
Represented By: ANNE M. DALENA
Represented By: KEVIN C. DONOVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET STEINHAUER
Represented By: ANNE M. DALENA
Represented By: KEVIN C. DONOVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES #1-12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLISON O'BRIEN
Represented By: ROGER C. MARTINDELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEVIN OLSON
Represented By: ROGER C. MARTINDELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?