NOLAN et al v. GREWAL et al
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF CAPE MAY and ROBERT A. NOLAN
Defendant: GURBIR S GREWAL and OFFICE OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, DEPARTMENT OF LAW, AND PUBLIC SAFETY, DIVISION OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE
Case Number: 3:2019cv18929
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jdb)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Case be Consolidated with 3:19cv18083 and REALLOCATING AND REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reallocated from the Camden Vicinage to the Trenton Vicinage. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/7/19. (dd, ) Modified on 11/13/2019 (eaj, ).
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from AAG Vannella re: Notice of Motion to Consoldiate This Case With 3:19-cv-18083, per L. Civ. R. 42.1. (VANNELLA, DANIEL)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GURBIR S GREWAL, OFFICE OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, DEPARTMENT OF LAW, AND PUBLIC SAFETY, DIVISION OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
October 25, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number CAM010770 (cry, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL MICHAEL VANNELLA on behalf of GURBIR S GREWAL, OFFICE OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, DEPARTMENT OF LAW, AND PUBLIC SAFETY, DIVISION OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE (VANNELLA, DANIEL)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OFFICE OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, DEPARTMENT OF LAW, AND PUBLIC SAFETY, DIVISION OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE. OFFICE OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, DEPARTMENT OF LAW, AND PUBLIC SAFETY, DIVISION OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE waiver sent on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (SARNO, MICHAEL)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GURBIR S GREWAL. GURBIR S GREWAL waiver sent on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (SARNO, MICHAEL)
October 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL RALPH SARNO on behalf of GURBIR S GREWAL, OFFICE OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, DEPARTMENT OF LAW, AND PUBLIC SAFETY, DIVISION OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE (SARNO, MICHAEL)
October 16, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
October 15, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT A NOLAN, COUNTY OF CAPE MAY, GURBIR S GREWAL, DEPARTMENT OF LAW & PUBLIC SAFETY DIVISION OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE, filed by ROBERT A. NOLAN.(LINDSAY, JEFFREY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOLAN et al v. GREWAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF CAPE MAY
Represented By: JEFFREY RYAN LINDSAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT A. NOLAN
Represented By: MICHAEL L. TESTA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURBIR S GREWAL
Represented By: DANIEL MICHAEL VANNELLA
Represented By: MICHAEL RALPH SARNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, DEPARTMENT OF LAW, AND PUBLIC SAFETY, DIVISION OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE
Represented By: DANIEL MICHAEL VANNELLA
Represented By: MICHAEL RALPH SARNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?