JACKSON v. AMAZON FULFILLMENT SERVICES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: QUANASIA JACKSON
Defendant: AMAZON FULFILLMENT SERVICES, INC. and JOHN DOES 1-5 AND 6-10
Case Number: 3:2019cv18986
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER setting a Telephone Conference Call for 1/10/20 at 9:30 a.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Defendant's counsel to initiate the call at that time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/12/19. (if, )
December 10, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/10/2019. (if, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by AMAZON FULFILLMENT SERVICES, INC..(DESMEDT, EMILY)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Initial Conference set for 12/10/2019 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/23/19. (if, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY C. DESMEDT on behalf of AMAZON FULFILLMENT SERVICES, INC. (DESMEDT, EMILY)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY D. CHILTON on behalf of AMAZON FULFILLMENT SERVICES, INC. (CHILTON, ASHLEY)
October 15, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMAZON FULFILLMENT SERVICES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/05/2019. (abr)
October 15, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (ROSENBLATT, RICHARD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON FULFILLMENT SERVICES, INC.. (ROSENBLATT, RICHARD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON FULFILLMENT SERVICES, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Mercer County, case number MER-L-001724-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10035534), filed by AMAZON FULFILLMENT SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ROSENBLATT, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. AMAZON FULFILLMENT SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON FULFILLMENT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD G. ROSENBLATT
Represented By: ASHLEY D. CHILTON
Represented By: EMILY C. DESMEDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5 AND 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUANASIA JACKSON
Represented By: KEVIN M. COSTELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?