AMATO v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: CARLO AMATO
Respondent: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2019cv19449
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by CARLO AMATO re #3 MOTION For Order That Petitioner Has Waived Attorney-Client Privilege re #1 First MOTION to Vacate set aside, or correct sentence (FREEMAN, JARRED)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from United States re Correcting Docket No. 3, Letter Motion re Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege re #3 MOTION For Order That Petitioner Has Waived Attorney-Client Privilege re #1 First MOTION to Vacate set aside, or correct sentence . (Attachments: #1 Brief Letter Motion re Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege, #2 Text of Proposed Order re Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege)(WIYGUL, ELISA)
December 11, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem)
December 11, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION For Order That Petitioner Has Waived Attorney-Client Privilege re #1 First MOTION to Vacate set aside, or correct sentence . Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION For Order That Petitioner Has Waived Attorney-Client Privilege re #1 First MOTION to Vacate set aside, or correct sentence by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege)(WIYGUL, ELISA)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Respondent shall file an answer to the #1 Motion within sixty (60) days of the entry of this Order; Petitioner may file and serve a reply in support of the Motion within thirty (30) days after the answer is filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/04/2019. (jem)
October 29, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard the motion hearing date set by the clerks office. The MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence is not technically a motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (abr)
October 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #1 First MOTION to Vacate set aside, or correct sentence. Motion set for 12/2/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr)
October 29, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp added. (abr)
October 29, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Carlo Amato was added to the docket as a defendant instead of Petitioner. The United States of America should have been added to the docket as a Respondent. The event selected Motion to Vacate is incorrect. This is an initial filing therefore the correct event is Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), which is found under Civil - Complaints and Other Initiating Documents, as opposed to the motion to vacate which is found under Motions. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 18-561(MAS) by CARLO AMATO. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Brief)(FREEMAN, JARRED)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMATO v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: NICHOLAS PAUL GRIPPO
Represented By: ELISA TALORA WIYGUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CARLO AMATO
Represented By: JARRED S. FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?