MCBURNIE v. CRC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM MCBURNIE
Defendant: BB&T Insurance Holdings, Inc., SAMUEL DAVISON OBENAUER, a Foreign Corporatio BB&T BANK (BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY), BB&T CORPORATION, CRC INSURANCE SERVICES INCORPORATED, JOHN HOWARD, BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY, XYZ CORPORATION I-V, JOHN DOE I-V, JANE DOE I-V, BB, CRC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. and DAVE OBENAUER
Case Number: 3:2019cv20018
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 2/18/2020 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER granting the request to adjourn Defendant's #5 Motion to Dismiss until 2/18/2020. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 12/17/2019. (jem)
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 Letter re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (NACCHIO, MICHAEL)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WILLIAM MCBURNIE re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Reply Affidavit)(NOBLE, GREGORY)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BB&T CORPORATION, BB&T INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY, CRC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC., JOHN HOWARD, SAMUEL DAVISON OBENAUER re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court (NACCHIO, MICHAEL)
November 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by BB&T CORPORATION, BB&T INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY, CRC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC..(NACCHIO, MICHAEL)
November 26, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion reset for 1/6/2020 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
November 22, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 12/16/2019 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Gregory B. Noble, Esq.. (NOBLE, GREGORY)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by WILLIAM MCBURNIE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Gregory B. Noble, #2 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Remand to State Court, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Remanding this Matter to State Court)(NOBLE, GREGORY)
November 21, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 12/16/2019 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN HOWARD, SAMUEL DAVISON OBENAUER. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(NACCHIO, MICHAEL)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BB&T CORPORATION, BB&T INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY, CRC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC., JOHN HOWARD, SAMUEL DAVISON OBENAUER. (NACCHIO, MICHAEL)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. LUCKNER on behalf of All Defendants (LUCKNER, STEVEN)
November 12, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SAMUEL DAVISON OBENAUER, BB&T INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., BB&T CORPORATION, BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY, CRC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC., JOHN HOWARD has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/29/2019. (jem)
November 8, 2019 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (NACCHIO, MICHAEL)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SAMUEL DAVISON OBENAUER, CRC INSURANCE SERVICES INCORPORATED, BB&T BANK (BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY), BB&T Insurance Holdings, Inc., BB&T CORPORATION, JOHN HOWARD from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number MON-L-3495-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10099887), filed by SAMUEL DAVISON OBENAUER, CRC INSURANCE SERVICES INCORPORATED, BB&T BANK (BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY), BB&T Insurance Holdings, Inc., BB&T CORPORATION, JOHN HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(NACCHIO, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCBURNIE v. CRC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BB&T Insurance Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: MICHAEL NACCHIO
Represented By: STEVEN J. LUCKNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL DAVISON OBENAUER
Represented By: MICHAEL NACCHIO
Represented By: STEVEN J. LUCKNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: a Foreign Corporatio BB&T BANK (BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY)
Represented By: MICHAEL NACCHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BB&T CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL NACCHIO
Represented By: STEVEN J. LUCKNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRC INSURANCE SERVICES INCORPORATED
Represented By: MICHAEL NACCHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN HOWARD
Represented By: MICHAEL NACCHIO
Represented By: STEVEN J. LUCKNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL NACCHIO
Represented By: STEVEN J. LUCKNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATION I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BB
Represented By: MICHAEL NACCHIO
Represented By: STEVEN J. LUCKNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL NACCHIO
Represented By: STEVEN J. LUCKNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE OBENAUER
Represented By: MICHAEL NACCHIO
Represented By: STEVEN J. LUCKNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM MCBURNIE
Represented By: GREGORY B. NOBLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?