TAWIL v. CHASE BANK USA, N.A.
Plaintiff: HENRY TAWIL
Defendant: CHASE BANK USA, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv20148
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE E. TARSON on behalf of CHASE BANK USA, N.A. (TARSON, MICHELLE)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS EDWARD STAGG on behalf of CHASE BANK USA, N.A. (STAGG, THOMAS)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER that JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. time to answer or move Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until 1/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/11/2019. (jem)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Stipulation Extending Time to Answer to January 13, 2020 by CHASE BANK USA, N.A.. (TARSON, MICHELLE)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHASE BANK USA, N.A.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
November 13, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ARI HILLEL MARCUS on behalf of HENRY TAWIL (MARCUS, ARI)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHASE BANK USA, N.A. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10108484) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HENRY TAWIL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ZELMAN, YITZCHAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAWIL v. CHASE BANK USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE BANK USA, N.A.
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD STAGG
Represented By: MICHELLE E. TARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY TAWIL
Represented By: YITZCHAK ZELMAN
Represented By: ARI HILLEL MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?