McDonald-Addison et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Gerald G. Addison and Teresa McDonald-Addison
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2019cv20285
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (BRENNAN, JESSICA)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (SHARKO, SUSAN)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Teresa McDonald-Addison, Gerald G. Addison. JOHNSON & JOHNSON waiver sent on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020; JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC waiver sent on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (eh, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
November 15, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Short Form Complaint by Gerald G. Addison, Teresa McDonald-Addison. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-01486. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER transferring the action to the District of New Jersey. Signed by John W. Nichols on 11/13/2019. (CGJ)
November 5, 2019 Remark: Notice of potential tag along action emailed to Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (KLH)
November 5, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KLH)
November 5, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
November 5, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3641313, filed by Teresa McDonald-Addison, Gerald G. Addison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald-Addison et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald G. Addison
Represented By: BRIAN A. GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa McDonald-Addison
Represented By: BRIAN A. GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC
Represented By: SUSAN M. SHARKO
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Represented By: JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: SUSAN M. SHARKO
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Represented By: JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?