GAGE v. PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS I. GAGE
Defendant: PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY, AFFORDABLE INSURANCE GROUP, INC., RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC, GOLDEN STATE CLAIM ADJUSTERS, INC. and PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv20396
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GOLDEN STATE CLAIM ADJUSTERS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/21/2020. (jmh)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Golden State Claims Adjusters, Inc... (JONES, MICHAEL)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. JONES on behalf of GOLDEN STATE CLAIM ADJUSTERS, INC., PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC (JONES, MICHAEL)
January 3, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/17/2020. (jmh)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group LLC.. (JONES, MICHAEL)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AFFORDABLE INSURANCE GROUP, INC., GOLDEN STATE CLAIM ADJUSTERS, INC., PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY, RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Summonses sent to Plaintiff via USPS on 11/21/2019.(jmh).
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed. See docket entry #1 . (jmh)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (mg)
November 15, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number NEW041081. (sms)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAGE v. PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFFORDABLE INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDEN STATE CLAIM ADJUSTERS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREFERRED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL J. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS I. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?