CARDY v. MARINER FINANCE LLC et al
Plaintiff: REBECCA CARDY
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5, JOHN DOES 6-10 and MARINER FINANCE LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv20401
Filed: November 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to 01/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 01/09/2020. (jdb)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MARINER FINANCE LLC. (RANJO, JASON)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON JOSEPH RANJO on behalf of MARINER FINANCE LLC (RANJO, JASON)
December 20, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MARINER FINANCE LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/09/2020. (jdb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by TOVA KATIMS on behalf of MARINER FINANCE LLC (KATIMS, TOVA)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS ANTON LINTHORST on behalf of MARINER FINANCE LLC (LINTHORST, THOMAS)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RANJO, JASON)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Doreen Haeslein o/b/o Mariner Finance LLC on December 4, 2019, filed by REBECCA CARDY. (MATCHETT, JACQUELYN)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARINER FINANCE LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
November 18, 2019 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
November 18, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: It was selected that this case has been filed AGAINST the Plaintiff . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
November 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELYN MATCHETT on behalf of REBECCA CARDY (MATCHETT, JACQUELYN)
November 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARINER FINANCE LLC, JOHN DOES 1-5, JOHN DOES 6-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10116482) with JURY DEMAND, filed by REBECCA CARDY.(COSTELLO, KEVIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARDY v. MARINER FINANCE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINER FINANCE LLC
Represented By: THOMAS ANTON LINTHORST
Represented By: JASON JOSEPH RANJO
Represented By: TOVA KATIMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA CARDY
Represented By: JACQUELYN MATCHETT
Represented By: KEVIN M. COSTELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?