DAFELDECKER v. AARGON AGENCY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: AMBER DAFELDECKER
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-25 and AARGON AGENCY, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv20725
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AARGON AGENCY, INC.. (HERRON, JONATHAN)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 Aargon Agency Inc ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(HERRON, JONATHAN)
December 23, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AARGON AGENCY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/07/2020. (jem)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to all Defendants.. (HERRON, JONATHAN)
December 23, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #4 Application for Clerk's Extension filed by Jonathan C. Herron, Esq. on 12/23/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE application USING Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. The Clerks office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (HERRON, JONATHAN)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMBER DAFELDECKER. AARGON AGENCY, INC. served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (KAPLAN, BEN)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AARGON AGENCY, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
November 26, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AARGON AGENCY, INC., JOHN DOES 1-25 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10139088) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AMBER DAFELDECKER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAPLAN, BEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAFELDECKER v. AARGON AGENCY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-25
Represented By: JONATHAN CORY HERRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARGON AGENCY, INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN CORY HERRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBER DAFELDECKER
Represented By: BEN A. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?