Hollander v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Joan S. Hollander
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2019cv20728
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (BRENNAN, JESSICA)
January 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joan S. Hollander. Joan S. Hollander waiver sent on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (eh, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 Short Form Complaint by Joan S. Hollander. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
November 26, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-09766. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 25, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (sjo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 11/20/2019) (sjo)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/23/2019) (rjm)
October 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian Alan Goldstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Joan S. Holland. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldstein, Brian) Modified on 10/23/2019 (dnh).
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Joan S. Holland. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Goldstein, Brian) Modified on 10/23/2019 (pc).
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldstein, Brian)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17816417)Document filed by Joan S. Holland.(Goldstein, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollander v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: SUSAN M. SHARKO
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Represented By: JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: SUSAN M. SHARKO
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Represented By: JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan S. Hollander
Represented By: Brian Alan Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?