ALTICE USA, INC. v. NEW JERSEY BOARD OF PUBLIC UTILITIES et al
Plaintiff: ALTICE USA, INC.
Defendant: NEW JERSEY BOARD OF PUBLIC UTILITIES, JOSEPH FIORDALISO, BOB M. GORDON, UPENDRA J. CHIVUKULA, COMMISIONER MARY-ANNA HOLDEN and DIANE SOLOMON
Case Number: 3:2019cv21371
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 32 BRIEF with proper electronic signature #11 (LAROSA, JEFFREY)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER ORDER that the application for a Motion for a TRO is denied with respect to the NEW JERSEY BOARD OF PUBLIC UTILITIES and is granted with respect to the COMMISIONER MARY-ANNA HOLDEN, JOSEPH FIORDALISO, DIANE SOLOMON, UPENDRA J. CHIVUKULA, and BOB M GORDON. This Preliminary Injunction is contingent upon the $2.11 million bond Altice posted on January 28, 2019 (ECF No. #30 ). Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 01/29/2020. (jdb)
January 28, 2020 Filing 30 Letter from Jeffrey T. LaRosa, Esq.. (LAROSA, JEFFREY)
January 27, 2020 Filing 29 Letter from Jeffrey T. LaRosa, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LAROSA, JEFFREY)
January 24, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #27 letter submitted by Thomas Gamarello on 01/24/2020 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jdb)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER: On or before 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, January 28, 2020, any party may file a brief of five or fewer pages concerning whether Plaintiff's proposed order (ECF No. 27-1) accurately reflects the ruling in the Court's opinion (ECF No. 25). In light of the exigencies of this case, the timetable provided in L.Civ.R. 7.1(e) will not apply. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 1/24/2020. (DS)
January 24, 2020 Filing 27 Letter from Altice USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GAMARELLO, THOMAS)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #18 Motion for Reconsideration the motion as to BPU, and will GRANT the motion as to the Board Members (subject to Altice posting a $2.11 million bond); the Clerk is directed to reopen the case; and that on or before 10:00 a.m. on Friday, January 25, 2020, Altice shall provide the Court with a proposed form of order consistent with the accompanying Opinion and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 01/22/2020. (jdb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 25 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 01/22/2020. (jdb)
January 17, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, Howard J. Symons, Devi M. Rao, Samuel C. Birnbaum and Matthew S. Hellman, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdb)
January 17, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GAMARELLO, THOMAS)
January 10, 2020 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Motion Hearing held on 1/10/2020 re #18 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by ALTICE USA, INC.. Court RESERVED decision. (Court Reporter/Recorder Megan McKay Soule.) (lr, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ALTICE USA, INC. re #18 MOTION for Reconsideration (GAMARELLO, THOMAS)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER re Letter request [doc. 20]. It is ordered that portion of the courts prior order [doc. 16] requiring individuals with settlement/decision making authority to appear is Rescinded. Please be guided accordingly. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 1/8/2020. (DS)
January 7, 2020 Filing 20 Letter from Meliha Arnautovic. (ARNAUTOVIC, MELIHA)
January 7, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #18 MOTION for Reconsideration (ARNAUTOVIC, MELIHA)
January 6, 2020 Notice of Hearing: Oral argument re #18 MOTION for Reconsideration set for 1/10/2020 @10:30 AM in NEWARK - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Parties confirmed. (DS)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration by ALTICE USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(GAMARELLO, THOMAS)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOSEPH FIORDALISO, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF PUBLIC UTILITIES, MARY-ANNA HOLDEN, DIANE SOLOMON, UPENDRA J. CHIVUKULA, Bob M Gordon, filed by ALTICE USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(GAMARELLO, THOMAS)
January 3, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Reconsideration . Motion set for 2/3/2020 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER re #15 Letter request. It is ordered that the Plaintiff may file an amended complaint and formal motion to reconsider by 12:00 p.m. on January 3, 2020; the defendant shall respond by 5:00 p.m. on January 7, 2020; the Plaintiff may reply by 5:00 p.m. on January 8, 2020; the Court will hear arguments on January 10, 2020 @10:30 a.m. in Courtroom #1, U.S. Post Office Building, Newark, NJ; all parties and individuals with settlement/decision making authority shall appear. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 12/30/2019. (DS)
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 Letter from Jeffrey T. LaRosa, Esq.. (LAROSA, JEFFREY)
December 27, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Howard J. Symons, Matthew S. Hellman, Devi M. Rao, and Samuel C. Birnbaum: $ 600, receipt number TRE108463 (jmh)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #1 ) This matter is DISMISSED for lack of subject jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 12/23/2019. (jdb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 12/23/2019. (jdb) Modified on 1/10/2020 (eaj, ).
December 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The Show Cause Hearing scheduled for 12/23/19 is CANCELLED. Plaintiff's application for a preliminary injunction and temporary restraints is DENIED. The case is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Formal order/opinion to be posted tomorrow. Counsel of record shall be responsible for advising each other of this order. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 12/22/19. (Fiore, J)
December 21, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Brief #11 submitted by Jeffrey Larosa on 12/21/2019 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jdb)
December 21, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF (reply) in support of OSC (LAROSA, JEFFREY)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Status Conference held on 12/20/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder Megan McKay Soule.) (lr, )
December 20, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 12/23/2019 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (lr, )
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Howard J. Symons, Esq., Matthew S. Hellman, Esq., Devi M. Rao, Esq., and Samuel C. Birnbaum, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 12/19/2019. (jdb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Meliha Arnautovic in reply to ECF 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Lawanda Gilbert, #2 Exhibit 2011petition)(ARNAUTOVIC, MELIHA)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MELIHA ARNAUTOVIC on behalf of JOSEPH FIORDALISO, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF PUBLIC UTILITIES (ARNAUTOVIC, MELIHA)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Status Conference held on 12/17/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder Megan McKay Soule.) (lr, )
December 17, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 12/20/2019 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (lr, )
December 17, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 1/21/2020 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ALTICE USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Jeffrey T. LaRosa, #3 Certification of Howard Symons, #4 Certification of Matthew Hellman, #5 Certification of Devi Rao, #6 Certification of Samuel Birnbaum, #7 Certificate of Service)(LAROSA, JEFFREY)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The Court will have an In-Person Conference on Plaintiff's Application for an Order to Show Cause [Doc. #1] set for 12/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in NEWARK - Courtroom #1, U.S. Post Office Building, 2 Federal Plaza, Newark, NJ. Further directed Plaintiff to notify the Attorney General. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 12/16/2019. (DS)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOSEPH FIORDALISO, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF PUBLIC UTILITIES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
December 16, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALTICE USA, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (LAROSA, JEFFREY)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10179863), filed by ALTICE USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraints, #10 Brief, #11 Certificate of Service)(LAROSA, JEFFREY)
December 13, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALTICE USA, INC. v. NEW JERSEY BOARD OF PUBLIC UTILITIES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY BOARD OF PUBLIC UTILITIES
Represented By: MELIHA ARNAUTOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH FIORDALISO
Represented By: MELIHA ARNAUTOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOB M. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPENDRA J. CHIVUKULA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISIONER MARY-ANNA HOLDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE SOLOMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTICE USA, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY T. LAROSA
Represented By: THOMAS N. GAMARELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?