LEWIS v. JOHNSON& JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: MONIQUE LEWIS
Defendant: JOHNSON& JOHNSON, Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc. and IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00588
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMERS, INC., JOHNSON& JOHNSON (BRENNAN, JESSICA)
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMERS, INC., JOHNSON& JOHNSON (SHARKO, SUSAN)
February 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMERS, INC., JOHNSON& JOHNSON (JAMES, SCOTT)
February 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMERS, INC., JOHNSON& JOHNSON (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMERS, INC., JOHNSON& JOHNSON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem)
February 4, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The documents attached to the #9 and #10 Summons - Request For Issue filed by Jason Joy, Esq. on 2/03/2020 was submitted incorrectly. For future reference, the document must be in Letter format identifying which parties a Summons must be issued for. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (jem)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Summons to be Issued by MONIQUE LEWIS as to Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc.. (JOY, JASON)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Summons to be Issued by MONIQUE LEWIS as to JOHNSON& JOHNSON. (JOY, JASON)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, JOHNSON& JOHNSON, filed by MONIQUE LEWIS.(JOY, JASON)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MONIQUE LEWIS. JOHNSON& JOHNSON served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (JOY, JASON)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MONIQUE LEWIS. Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc. served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (JOY, JASON)
January 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC, JOHNSON& JOHNSON, Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pth)
January 19, 2020 Member Case Direct File on 1/16/20, for MDL 16-2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (pth)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by MONIQUE LEWIS as to JOHNSON& JOHNSON. (JOY, JASON)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by MONIQUE LEWIS as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. (JOY, JASON)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by MONIQUE LEWIS as to Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc.. (JOY, JASON)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC, JOHNSON& JOHNSON, Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10258319) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MONIQUE LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JOY, JASON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEWIS v. JOHNSON& JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONIQUE LEWIS
Represented By: JASON JOSEPH JOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON& JOHNSON
Represented By: GENE M. WILLIAMS
Represented By: Kelly Lee Dawson
Represented By: SUSAN M. SHARKO
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Represented By: JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI
Represented By: PATRICK LEO OOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumers, Inc.
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: Kelly Lee Dawson
Represented By: SUSAN M. SHARKO
Represented By: JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN
Represented By: PATRICK LEO OOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC
Represented By: Leslie Benitez
Represented By: Cullen W. Guilmartin
Represented By: LORNA A. DOTRO
Represented By: MARK K. SILVER
Represented By: Nancy M. Erfle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?