THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY v. MID-STATES PACKAGING, INC.
Plaintiff: THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
Defendant: MID-STATES PACKAGING INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02184
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 04/27/2020. (jmh)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MID-STATES PACKAGING INC. identifying Mid-States Packaging as Corporate Parent.. (CRINO, THOMAS)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by MID-STATES PACKAGING INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CRINO, THOMAS)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, complaint, exhibits, disclosure statement served on Paul Short, CFO on 3/6/2020, filed by THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY. (TERIS, BENJAMIN)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MID-STATES PACKAGING INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
February 28, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
February 28, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: It was selected that this case has been filed AGAINST the Plaintiffs. In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MID-STATES PACKAGING, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10473968), filed by THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY (DELAWARE). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, #3 Summons)(TERIS, BENJAMIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY v. MID-STATES PACKAGING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MID-STATES PACKAGING INC.
Represented By: THOMAS M. CRINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN S. TERIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?