BARABAS v. BARNES & NOBLE COLLEGE BOOKSELLERS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MARTHA BARABAS
Defendant: CENGAGE LEARNING, INC., BARNES & NOBLE EDUCATION, INC., FOLLETT HIGHER EDUCATION GROUP, INC., MCGRAW-HILL GLOBAL EDUCATION HOLDINGS, LLC, BARNES & NOBLE COLLEGE BOOKSELLERS, LLC, PEARSON EDUCATION, INC. and FOLLETT HIGHER EDUCATION GROUP
Case Number: 3:2020cv02442
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER re #12 Letter, #13 Letter. The Court has received Defendants' proposed briefing schedule with respect to their incoming motion to transfer, and their request to adjourn the deadline to file a response to the Complaint. Having reviewed Plaintiff's objection, the Court DENIES Defendants' request. The schedule set forth in the Text Order, dated March 25, 2020, remains in effect. To the extent Defendants wish to file a motion to transfer, along with a motion to dismiss, they may do so simultaneously in one omnibus motion. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/10/2020. (Fang, W)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from John Radice in response to Defendants' April 8 letter re: scheduling the motion to transfer and motion to dismiss briefing re #12 Letter. (RADICE, JOHN)
April 8, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Stephanie D. Edelson, Esq.. (Edelson, Stephanie)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDA G. HARVEY on behalf of FOLLETT HIGHER EDUCATION GROUP (HARVEY, LINDA)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Per Standing Order 2020-04, the deadline for Defendants to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended from March 27, 2020 to May 11, 2020. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/25/2020. (jmm, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from John Radice (1) responding to Defendants' March 23 letter and (2) seeking scheduling order re #8 Letter. (RADICE, JOHN)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Stephanie D. Edelson, Esq.. (Edelson, Stephanie)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie D. Edelson on behalf of CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Edelson, Stephanie)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARTHA BARABAS. BARNES & NOBLE EDUCATION, INC. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (RADICE, JOHN)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARTHA BARABAS. BARNES & NOBLE COLLEGE BOOKSELLERS, LLC served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (RADICE, JOHN)
March 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARTHA BARABAS. CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (RADICE, JOHN)
March 15, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARTHA BARABAS. FOLLETT HIGHER EDUCATION GROUP served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (RADICE, JOHN)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BARNES & NOBLE COLLEGE BOOKSELLERS, LLC, BARNES & NOBLE EDUCATION, INC., CENGAGE LEARNING, INC., FOLLETT HIGHER EDUCATION GROUP, MCGRAW-HILL GLOBAL EDUCATION HOLDINGS, LLC, PEARSON EDUCATION, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
March 5, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BARNES & NOBLE COLLEGE BOOKSELLERS, LLC, BARNES & NOBLE EDUCATION, INC., CENGAGE LEARNING, INC., FOLLETT HIGHER EDUCATION GROUP, INC., MCGRAW-HILL GLOBAL EDUCATION HOLDINGS, LLC, PEARSON EDUCATION, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10513493) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARTHA BARABAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RADICE, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARABAS v. BARNES & NOBLE COLLEGE BOOKSELLERS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENGAGE LEARNING, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie D. Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARNES & NOBLE EDUCATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOLLETT HIGHER EDUCATION GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCGRAW-HILL GLOBAL EDUCATION HOLDINGS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARNES & NOBLE COLLEGE BOOKSELLERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEARSON EDUCATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOLLETT HIGHER EDUCATION GROUP
Represented By: LINDA G. HARVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA BARABAS
Represented By: JOHN D. RADICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?