BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC et al v. LUPIN LTD. et al
Plaintiff: BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC and BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.
Defendant: LUPIN LTD. and LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02744
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.. LUPIN LTD. waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. (LOWER, J.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 AO120 Patent Form filed. (mg)
March 12, 2020 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10545854), filed by BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED, KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 L. Civ. R. 11.2 Certification)(DENI, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC et al v. LUPIN LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAUSCH HEALTH IRELAND LIMITED
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAKEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?