1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST v. WILLOW CREEK REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER et al
Plaintiff: 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST
Defendant: GENESIS HEALTHCARE, INC. and WILLOW CREEK REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER
Intervenor Defendant: Willow Creek Propco LLC and Complete Care at Willow Creek LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv03371
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER ORDER to Counsel regarding the correspondence notifying the Court that defendant Genesis Healthcare, Inc. has agreed to pay the disputed death benefit of $28,000 to the family of Rose Palmer. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 05/13/2020. (jdb)
May 9, 2020 Filing 21 Letter from Plaintiff. (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE re #19 Letter. (CAPOZZI, LOUIS)
May 4, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone Conference held on 5/4/2020. (jmm, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 19 Letter from Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(HANSEN, KATHERINE)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Intervene. Motion was granted during the telephone conference call held on 3/31/2020 and there being no objections. Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/2/2020. (jmm, )
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining; denying #5 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause, Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 04/01/2020. (jdb)
March 31, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone Conference held on 3/31/2020. Court Denied with conditions Motion #4 #5 for Temporary Restraining Order. Court Granted Motion #15 to intervene. Order to be submitted.(Not on the record) (jmm, ) Modified on 4/1/2020 (jmm).
March 31, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST re #5 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
March 31, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene by Complete Care at Willow Creek LLC, Willow Creek Propco LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Brief, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(CAPOZZI, LOUIS)
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #5 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Natalie Holland, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SHEMTOB, BRANDON)
March 31, 2020 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHEMTOB, BRANDON)
March 31, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 5/4/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
March 30, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone Conference held on 3/30/2020. Telephone conference call set for 3/31/2020 at 2:00 P.M. (jmm, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Larry J. Rappoport by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SHEMTOB, BRANDON)
March 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON SHABY SHEMTOB on behalf of All Defendants (SHEMTOB, BRANDON)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GENESIS HEALTHCARE, INC., WILLOW CREEK REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST re #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #8 Declaration, #6 Declaration (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of WILLIAM S. MASSEY re #5 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(HANSEN, KATHERINE)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST re #5 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION re #5 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST. (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause , Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HANSEN, KATHERINE)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause , Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST. (HANSEN, KATHERINE)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM SAMUEL MASSEY on behalf of 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST (MASSEY, WILLIAM)
March 30, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion reset for 5/4/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
March 30, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button.Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
March 30, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
March 30, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 4/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr)
March 30, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Larry J. Rappoport. Motion set for 5/4/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
March 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(HANSEN, KATHERINE)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GENESIS HEALTHCARE, INC. and WILLOW CREEK REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10615009), filed by 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HANSEN, KATHERINE) Modified on 3/30/2020 (abr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST v. WILLOW CREEK REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENESIS HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: BRANDON SHABY SHEMTOB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLOW CREEK REHABILITATION AND CARE CENTER
Represented By: BRANDON SHABY SHEMTOB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST
Represented By: KATHERINE H. HANSEN
Represented By: WILLIAM SAMUEL MASSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Willow Creek Propco LLC
Represented By: LOUIS J. CAPOZZI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Complete Care at Willow Creek LLC
Represented By: LOUIS J. CAPOZZI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?