SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND AS SUBROGEE OF BTNJ, LLC/POWER & AUTOMATION v. MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND AS SUBROGEE OF BTNJ, LLC/POWER & AUTOMATION
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5, ANTY TRUCKING, INC., ABC CORPS 1-5, MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION and OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv04310
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER granting Mitsubishi Electric request for 30 day extension. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/14/2020. (abr)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Steven Kluxen, Esq. (KLUXEN, STEVEN)
April 24, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiffs Complaint in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Motion set for 5/18/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiffs Complaint in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.. Responses due by 5/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order, #2 Brief Memo of Law in Support, #3 Certificate of Service COS, #4 Exhibit Exhibit)(WESCOE, JAMES)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 7/7/2020 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 4/17/2020. (if, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC. identifying Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (WESCOE, JAMES)
April 15, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC. from Mercer County Superior Court of New Jersey, case number L-667-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10686556), filed by OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A)(WESCOE, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND AS SUBROGEE OF BTNJ, LLC/POWER & AUTOMATION v. MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTY TRUCKING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.
Represented By: JAMES A. WESCOE
Represented By: KATHERINE ANNE TENZINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND AS SUBROGEE OF BTNJ, LLC/POWER & AUTOMATION
Represented By: STEVEN A. KLUXEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?