DRUG INFORMATION RETRIEVAL SYSTEM v. MYRXPPROFILE
Plaintiff: Drug Information Retrieval System
Defendant: MyRXProfile
Case Number: 3:2020cv05607
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DRUG INFORMATION RETRIEVAL SYSTEM, LLMC. MYRXPROFILE, LLC waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (KRIEGEL, MARK)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DRUG INFORMATION RETRIEVAL SYSTEM, LLMC. (KRIEGEL, MARK)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MYRXPROFILE, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 AO120 Patent Form filed. (abr)
May 7, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr)
May 7, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MyRXProfile ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10779578) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Drug Information Retrieval System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A of Complaint, #2 Exhibit B of Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KRIEGEL, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DRUG INFORMATION RETRIEVAL SYSTEM v. MYRXPPROFILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drug Information Retrieval System
Represented By: MARK AARON KRIEGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MyRXProfile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?