FEDERICI DENTAL, P.A. v. THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: FEDERICI DENTAL, P.A.
Defendant: THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. and CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2020cv05772
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FEDERICI DENTAL, P.A.. CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA waiver sent on 5/28/2020, answer due 7/27/2020; THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 5/28/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (HURD, RYAN)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY S. SPIZER on behalf of FEDERICI DENTAL, P.A. (SPIZER, GREGORY)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
May 11, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FEDERICI DENTAL, P.A.. (HURD, RYAN)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC., CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10797982) with JURY DEMAND, filed by FEDERICI DENTAL, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(HURD, RYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERICI DENTAL, P.A. v. THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERICI DENTAL, P.A.
Represented By: RYAN D. HURD
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?