GRAND CRU, LLC v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: GRAND CRU, LLC and GRAND CRU, LLC doing business as RESTAURANT NICHOLAS
Defendant: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY and LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2020cv06878
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by GRAND CRU, LLC re #15 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and to Remand the Action to State Court (Attachments: #1 Certification of Nicholas Harary, #2 Certification of Counsel)(DELUCA, STEPHANIE)
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY re #9 First MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Certification of C. Finazzo, #2 Exhibits A and B to Certification of C. Finazzo)(FINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)
July 27, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #15 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and to Remand the Action to State Court, #9 First MOTION to Stay . Motions reset for 8/17/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT ORDER that the return dates for Defendants' #9 Motion to Stay and the Plaintiff's #15 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and to Remand the Action to State Court are ADJOURNED to 8/17/2020; the time for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is extended to 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/24/2020. (jem)
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Order ADJOURNING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO REMAND THE ACTION TO STATE COURT, AND EXTENDING THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by GRAND CRU, LLC re #15 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and to Remand the Action to State Court, #9 First MOTION to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order)(DELUCA, STEPHANIE)
July 15, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF in Opposition filed by GRAND CRU, LLC re #9 First MOTION to Stay (DELUCA, STEPHANIE)
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 BRIEF in Opposition filed by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY re #15 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and to Remand the Action to State Court (Attachments: #1 Certification of Christopher S. Finazzo, Esq., in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Remand, #2 Exhibits A - J of Finazzo Certification, #3 Certificate of Service)(FINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)
June 30, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #15 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and to Remand the Action to State Court, #9 First MOTION to Stay . Motion set for 8/3/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT ORDER adjourning the return date for Defendants' Motion to Stay and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file a Second Amended Complaint and Remand the Action to State Court to 08/03/2020. It is further Ordered that any and all opposition to the Motions must be filed and served by 07/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 06/30/2020. (jmh)
June 30, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Order Adjourning Defendants' Motion to Stay and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and to Remand to State Court by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY re #15 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and to Remand the Action to State Court, #9 First MOTION to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Consent Order)(HAGER, RACHEL)
June 26, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #15 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and to Remand the Action to State Court. Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and to Remand the Action to State Court by GRAND CRU, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Brief of Plaintiff, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DELUCA, STEPHANIE)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER that the Initial Conference set for 7/21/2020 at 10:30 AM is adjourned to 8/25/2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/19/2020. (jem)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 6/19/2020. (jem)
June 19, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #9 First MOTION to Stay . Motion reset for 7/20/2020 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT ORDER adjourning Defendants' #9 Motion to Stay until 7/20/2020; Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is extended until 8/03/2020. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 6/19/2020. (jem)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Order ADJ MOT & EXTEND TIME by GRAND CRU, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LETTER)(DICICCO, MICHAEL)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company Only by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY, OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (HAGER, RACHEL)
June 11, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #9 First MOTION to Stay . Motion set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION to Stay by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY, OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(FINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT F. COSSOLINI on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY, OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY (COSSOLINI, ROBERT)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL R. HAGER on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY, OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY (HAGER, RACHEL)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Initial Conference set via telephone for 7/21/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. Attached are the call-in instructions for the call. Counsel are directed to call in at the scheduled time. (Attachment: Instructions and call in information).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Conference DEA) (ce3)
June 5, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/26/2020. (jem)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Mid-Atlantic Insurance Company, and Ohio Security Insurance Company.. (FINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)
June 5, 2020 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY. (FINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY from Monmouth County Superior Court, case number MON-L-1122-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10904331), filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - Monmouth County Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal - First Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(FINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAND CRU, LLC v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRAND CRU, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL M. DICICCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRAND CRU, LLC doing business as RESTAURANT NICHOLAS
Represented By: MICHAEL M. DICICCO
Represented By: STEPHANIE L. DELUCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. FINAZZO
Represented By: RACHEL R. HAGER
Represented By: ROBERT F. COSSOLINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. FINAZZO
Represented By: RACHEL R. HAGER
Represented By: ROBERT F. COSSOLINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. FINAZZO
Represented By: RACHEL R. HAGER
Represented By: ROBERT F. COSSOLINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?