Copeland v. US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National et al
Plaintiff: MARCIA COPELAND
Defendant: Governor's Office, NAN FAMULAR, Sell-All-Properties, SURETY TITLE COMPANY, Gary Zeitz, ATTORNEY GENERAL OFFICE, CAMDEN COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, US BANK N.A., Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz, Tax Office and Wells Fargo N.A.
Case Number: 3:2020cv07016
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 67 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:19-cv-01156. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 27, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Johnson, D.)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: See attached, For the reasons stated herein, the Court orders that this case be transferred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/26/20.(Constantine, A.)
May 11, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for Multiple Relief by Marcia Copeland. (Peterson, M)
May 5, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE by Marcia Copeland (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Peterson, M)
May 5, 2020 Filing 63 OBJECTION re #58 Amended Complaint, by Camden County Sheriff's Office. (Gerarde, Thomas)
April 29, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION and Response by Marcia Copeland. (Peterson, M)
April 29, 2020 Filing 61 RESPONSE filed by Marcia Copeland. (Peterson, M)
April 28, 2020 Filing 60 OBJECTION re #58 Amended Complaint, filed by Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Surety Title Company, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz. (Greene, Gary)
April 23, 2020 Filing 59 OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Sell-All-Properties. (Gardner, Kristi)
April 16, 2020 Filing 58 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Attorney General Office, Camden County Sheriff's Office, Nan Famular, Governor's Office, Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Sell-All-Properties, Surety Title Company, Tax Office, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, US Bank, NA, Wells Fargo N.A., Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz, filed by Marcia Copeland.(Peterson, M)
April 7, 2020 Filing 57 OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of time and Motion Request for Rule 16 Conference filed by Sell-All-Properties. (Gardner, Kristi)
April 6, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for New Rule 16 Schedule for District Court Preparation of New Summons and Subpoenas by Marcia Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M) Modified on 6/1/2020 (Johnson, D.).
April 6, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Individualized Complaints by Marcia Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
March 31, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Camden County Sheriff's Office.Responses due by 4/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Concerning Motion to Dismiss)(Gerarde, Thomas)
March 30, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Regarding Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Obligation to File a Motion Response or Answer to the Complaint, As Amended Order by Wells Fargo N.A.. (Bizar, David)
March 25, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for entry of Nonsuit re #50 Amended Complaint, #49 Amended Complaint, 44 Order on Motion for Order,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #51 MOTION for Nonsuit pursuant to Rule 41(b) Order by Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz.Responses due by 4/15/2020 (Greene, Gary)
March 20, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Nonsuit pursuant to Rule 41(b) Order by Sell-All-Properties. (Gardner, Kristi)
March 20, 2020 Filing 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Attorney General Office, Camden County Sheriff's Office, Nan Famular, Governor's Office, Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Sell-All-Properties, Surety Title Company, Tax Office, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, US Bank, NA, Wells Fargo N.A., Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz, filed by Marcia Copeland. (Peterson, M)
March 19, 2020 Filing 49 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Attorney General Office, Camden County Sheriff's Office, Nan Famular, Governor's Office, Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Sell-All-Properties, Surety Title Company, Tax Office, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, US Bank, NA, Wells Fargo N.A., Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz, filed by Marcia Copeland. (Peterson, M)
March 17, 2020 Filing 48 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Attorney General Office, Camden County Sheriff's Office, Nan Famular, Governor's Office, Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Sell-All-Properties, Surety Title Company, Tax Office, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, US Bank, NA, Wells Fargo N.A., Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz, filed by Marcia Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
March 13, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE by Marcia Copeland (Attachments: #1 Mailing Label) (Peterson, M)
February 24, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 3/3/2020 (Constantine, A.)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: The plaintiff's motions for default judgment #33 #34 are denied. First, the plaintiff does not identify to which party the motion is directed. Second, the motions are premature. "Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55 provides a two-step process to obtain a default judgment." Ramos v. Univ. of Connecticut Health Ctr., No. 3:17CV326(VAB), 2018 WL 2465356, at *2 (D. Conn. June 1, 2018). When a party against whom affirmative relief is sought has failed to plead or otherwise defend, the first step is to seek entry of default. Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). "The second step is to seek a default judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b)." Ramos, 2018 WL 2465356, at *2. "Under Rule 55(b)(2), a court must determine whether liability is appropriate, based on the facts alleged in the Complaint." Id. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/11/20. (Constantine, A.)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: The motion to dismiss #40 filed by Sell All Properties is denied without prejudice. Sell All Properties is not a named defendant in the operative complaint #14 . Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/11/20. (Constantine, A.)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: The pro se plaintiff's complaint [ECF #14] is exceedingly difficult to decipher and it is not clear which defendants are accused of what causes of action or when particular conduct occurred. In light of the fact that the plaintiff is self-represented, the Court will permit her an opportunity to amend. She is advised that she is required to set forth "enough facts to state a claim to relief that is plausible on its face." Bell Atl. Corp. v. Twombly, 550 U.S. 544, 570 (2007). "A claim has facial plausibility when the pleaded factual content allows the court to draw the reasonable inference that the defendant is liable for the misconduct alleged." Ashcroft v. Iqbal, 556 U.S. 662, 678 (2009). This means she must set forth in her amended complaint facts regarding what was done to her, who did it, when they did it, and how that has injured her. She should be as specific as possible and clearly identify which defendant has taken particular actions against her. While it is not necessary that she cite statutes or legal authority, she must set forth enough facts from which the Court can discern a plausible legal claim as to each named defendant. The plaintiff may find it helpful to utilize the complaint forms available on the Court's website. The plaintiff shall file any amended complaint within 21 days.Should the plaintiff file an amended complaint in accordance with this order, the Court will deny the motions to dismiss [ECF 27, 39] because they will not address the operative complaint. But defendants will be allowed to move to dismiss any new complaint and incorporate by reference their prior briefing. In light of this Order, the plaintiff's motions to amend #35 #36 are denied as moot. In addition, the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion for preliminary injunction #15 because it is improperly docketed as a motion instead of an amended complaint. The plaintiff's discovery request directed at Gary and Robin Zeitz #31 is denied because they are not named defendants in the operative complaint [ECF #14] and even if they were, discovery requests are not filed with the Court. D. Conn. L. Civ. 5(f)(1). Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/11/20. (Constantine, A.)
November 1, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A. Fontaine on behalf of Sell-All-Properties (Fontaine, Craig)
November 1, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Marie Gardner on behalf of Sell-All-Properties (Gardner, Kristi)
October 17, 2019 Filing 41 OBJECTION re #34 MOTION for Default Judgment as to any Defendant without an August 28, 2019 Answer to this Complaint, #36 MOTION to Amend/Correct, #33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Any Defendant without An August 28, 2019 Answer to this Compliant, #35 MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Amended Complaint,, #31 MOTION for filed by Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Surety Title Company, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz. (Greene, Gary)
October 10, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss by Sell-All-Properties.Responses due by 10/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Supplement Notice to Self Rep Litigant)(Gardner, Kristi)
September 30, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Camden County Sheriff's Office.Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Concerning Motion to Dismiss)(Gerarde, Thomas)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: The #37 motion is GRANTED. If the plaintiff's #35 #36 motions to amend are granted, Wells Fargo shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the operative complaint 14 days after the proposed second amended complaint is docketed. If the #35 #36 motions to amend are denied, Wells Fargo shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the operative complaint 14 days after the denials. In addition, these deadlines to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the operative complaint shall apply to all defendants. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/30/2019. (Ram, Megha)
September 27, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time until 14 Days After the Proposed Second Amended Complaint is Docketed if the Motions are Allowed, or Until 14 Days After the Denial of the Motions to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Second Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo N.A.. (Bizar, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Amend or Add: Additional Federal and Criminal Title of Action Codes by Marcia Copeland. Responses due by 10/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
September 25, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Amend #14 Amended Complaint by Marcia Copeland. Responses due by 10/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
September 16, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Sell-All-Properties to 10/12/2019. (Johnson, D.)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The #30 motion for extension is GRANTED. Defendant Sell-All-Properties shall have until October 12, 2019 to file a response to plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/16/2019. (Ram, Megha)
September 13, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Default Judgment as to any Defendant without an August 28, 2019 Answer to this Complaint by Marcia Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Peterson, M)
September 13, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to any Defendant without an August 28, 2019 Answer to this Complaint by Marcia Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
September 13, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Order by Marcia Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
September 12, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 12, 2019 to Plead by Sell-All-Properties. (Gardner, Kristi)
September 12, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Marie Gardner on behalf of Sell-All-Properties (Gardner, Kristi)
September 12, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A. Fontaine on behalf of Sell-All-Properties (Fontaine, Craig)
September 5, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Surety Title Company, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz.Responses due by 9/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Notice to Defendant, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Affidavit)(Greene, Gary)
September 3, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Camden County Sheriff's Office to 9/30/2019. (Johnson, D.)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The #25 motion for extension by Camden County Sheriff's Office is GRANTED. Camden County Sheriff's Office shall have until September 30, 2019 to file an answer or other response to the plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/3/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 30, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 30, 2019 to File a Responsive Pleading #14 Amended Complaint, by Camden County Sheriff's Office. (Gerarde, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Kontyko on behalf of Camden County Sheriff's Office (Kontyko, Kaitlin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Gerarde on behalf of Camden County Sheriff's Office (Gerarde, Thomas)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Returning Submission as Deficient: Complaint, Addendum to Original returned to Plaintiff Marcia Copeland Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/28/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE: The Court received a set of papers mailed directly to chambers by plaintiff. This is not proper. The plaintiff is advised that she cannot send documents directly to chambers or to the judge. The plaintiff may - and shall - bring any matter related to the case she wishes to the Court's attention by filing a pleading or motion on the docket. To do that, she should either file an appearance and request to participate in e-filing or she must send the document to the Clerk's Office to be docketed as a motion or a pleading. Accordingly, the Clerk shall return the papers to the plaintiff and shall not docket them. The Clerk shall also mail a copy of this order to plaintiff. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/28/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 27, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Wells Fargo N.A. to 9/30/2019. (Johnson, D.)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The plaintiff mailed a set of papers to the Clerk's Office entitled "Amendmened Complaint and Request for Injunction." The Court notes that the Clerk's Office filed this document on the docket twice -- once as an #14 amended complaint and once as a #15 motion for preliminary injunction. The Court further notes that there is only one operative complaint. Now that the plaintiff has filed an #14 amended complaint, that document is the operative complaint. The plaintiff is advised that any allegations in the #1 original complaint that are not also in the #14 amended complaint will not be considered by the Court. Accordingly, the #12 motion to dismiss by Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Surety Title Company, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, Gary Zeitz, and Robin Zeitz is DENIED AS MOOT as it no longer refers to the operative complaint. However, these defendants may renew their motion to dismiss in light of the amended complaint and incorporate by reference any prior briefing. In addition, the #18 motion for extension by Wells Fargo N.A. is GRANTED. Wells Fargo N.A. shall have until September 30, 2019 to file an answer or other response to the plaintiff's amended complaintSigned by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/27/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Surety Title Company, Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz re #11 Notice (Other) (Greene, Gary)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 30, 2019 to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the #1 Complaint by Wells Fargo N.A.. (Bizar, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo N.A.. (Bizar, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Bizar on behalf of Wells Fargo N.A. (Bizar, David)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Defendants filed a #12 motion to dismiss and a #11 notice to self-represented litigant. Pursuant to Local Rule 12(a), the movant "shall attach to the notice [to self-represented litigant] copies of the full text of Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7." Defendants did not attach copies of these rules to the #11 notice to self-represented litigant. Defendants shall refile, by August 27, 2019, the notice to self-represented litigant along with copies of the full text of Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/26/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Surety Title Company, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz.Responses due by 9/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Unreported Case)(Greene, Gary)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Surety Title Company, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz of Filing Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(a) (Greene, Gary)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Joseph Greene on behalf of Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Surety Title Company, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz (Greene, Gary)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Marcia Copeland. Responses due by 9/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Attorney General Office, Camden County Sheriff's Office, Nan Famular, Governor's Office, Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Sell-All-Properties, Surety Title Company, Tax Office, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, US Bank, NA, Wells Fargo N.A., Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz, filed by Marcia Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE: Amend Caption to Include the Following Additional Defendants by Marcia Copeland (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Attorney General Office, Camden County Sheriff's Office, Nan Famular, Governor's Office, Law Firm of Gary Zeitz, Sell-All-Properties, Surety Title Company, Tax Office, US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National, US Bank, NA, Wells Fargo N.A., Gary Zeitz, Robin Zeitz* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Marcia Copeland* *2 Apple Ridge Way* *East Brunswick, NJ 08816* (Fazekas, J.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Marcia Copeland, #5 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Marcia Copeland Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR - STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/26/2019.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 7/29/2019 (Fazekas, J.).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/26/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/26/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/24/2019. Discovery due by 1/25/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/29/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/26/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Manual Filing of CD of Court Hearing, Camden District Court by Marcia Copeland (Fazekas, J.) On MSD1 (Blough, B.).
July 26, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 7/29/2019 to correct file date (Fazekas, J.).
July 26, 2019 Filing fee received from Jackson Anesthesia LLC: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00010418. (Fazekas, J.)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marcia Copeland.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copeland v. US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAN FAMULAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sell-All-Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SURETY TITLE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Zeitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMDEN COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank Cust PC5 Sterling National
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US BANK N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Firm of Gary Zeitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Zeitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCIA COPELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?